Shuler Drilling Company, Inc. v. Southern Management Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Shuler Drilling Company, Inc.
Defendant: Superior Well Drilling, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Southern Management Services, Inc.
Garnishee: Carter Federal Credit Union, Weiser-Brown Operating Company and Lion Oil Trading & Transportation, LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv01049
Filed: August 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #98 Motion to Withdraw Filing of Motion for Attorney Fees; denying as moot #97 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 21, 2018. (cnn)
March 15, 2018 Filing 98 MOTION to Withdraw #97 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc.. (Ratcliff, Brian)
March 12, 2018 Filing 97 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PPGMR Billing Documents)(Ratcliff, Brian)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting and denying in part #91 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 27, 2018. (cnn)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #74 Motion for Relief from Voidable Transactions; see order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 26, 2018. (cnn)
January 19, 2018 Filing 94 NOTICE OF FILING OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motions hearing held on October 27, 2017, before Judge Susan O. Hickey. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Felisha Burson, Telephone number (870) 677-6075. Envelope No. FB-2017-70. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber. After the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline, it, or a redacted transcript, may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER A Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of the Transcript MUST be filed within 7 calendar days of the filing of the transcript and served manually on the court reporter/transcriber. Redaction Request due 2/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/19/2018. (mll) Modified on 1/19/2018 (mll). Modified on 1/22/2018 to edit text (lw).
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER directing Defendant to file a supplemental response to Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Voidable Transactions on or before 2/5/2018. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 19, 2018. (mll) Modified on 1/22/2018 to add text (lw).
November 20, 2017 Filing 92 RESPONSE in Opposition re #91 MOTION for Protective Order and Brief in Support filed by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc.. (Ratcliff, Brian)
November 10, 2017 Filing 91 MOTION for Protective Order and Brief in Support by Southern Management Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 11/02/17 Email and Proposed Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B - 11/02/17 Response Email, #3 Exhibit C - 11/02/17 Email String, #4 Exhibit D - 11/03/17 Email String, #5 Exhibit E - 11/06/17 Email String, #6 Exhibit F - 11/06/07 and 11/07/17 Email String, #7 Exhibit G - Proposed Protective Order)(Johnson, William)
November 2, 2017 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by William A. Johnson on behalf of Southern Management Services, Inc.. (Johnson, William)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying #64 Motion for Sanctions and for Attorney Fees; see order for further specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 30, 2017. (cnn)
October 30, 2017 Filing 88 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Susan O. Hickey: Motion Hearing held on 10/30/2017. (Felisha Burson-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in El Dorado-2nd Flr) (rwg)
October 30, 2017 Filing 87 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #86 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. William A. Johnson is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 30, 2017. (ljl)
October 27, 2017 Filing 86 MOTION for Attorney William A Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number 0861-1612431) by Southern Management Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of William A Johnson, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Biographical Data)(Johnson, William)
October 27, 2017 Filing 85 RESPONSE to Motion re #50 MOTION to Compel filed by Southern Management Services, Inc.. (Crane, Steve)
September 28, 2017 Filing 84 REPLY to Response to Motion re #64 Amended MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Southern Management Services, Inc.. (Crane, Steve)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Show Cause Response due by 9/28/2017; Southern Management is directed to file a response to Plaintiffs Motion for Rule 37 Sanctions and Attorneys Fees #64 by September 28, 2017, explaining why Southern Management has failed to respond to the Courts order and why the Court should not find that Southern Management and its officers are in contempt of Court. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 26, 2017. (cnn)
September 25, 2017 Filing 82 TEXT ONLY ORDER ReSetting Hearing on #64 Amended MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for Attorney Fees and #74 MOTION for Relief from Voidable Transactions. Motion Hearing is reset for 10/30/2017 @ 09:00 AM in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 25, 2017. (rwg)
September 25, 2017 Filing 81 REPLY to Response to Motion re #74 MOTION for Relief from Voidable Transactions filed by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc.. (Ratcliff, Brian)
September 21, 2017 Filing 80 RESPONSE to Motion re #74 MOTION for Relief from Voidable Transactions filed by Southern Management Services, Inc.. (Crane, Steve)
September 14, 2017 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Steve R. Crane on behalf of Southern Management Services, Inc.. (Crane, Steve)
September 14, 2017 Filing 78 *** DISREGARD filed under wrong attorney login/password *** NOTICE of Appearance by David F. Butler on behalf of Southern Management Services, Inc.. (Butler, David) Modified on 9/15/2017 (cnn).
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying as moot #62 Motion for Sanctions; denying as moot #62 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 14, 2017. (mll)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion(s) #74 MOTION for Relief from Voidable Transactions, #64 Amended MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for Attorney Fees Hearing set for 9/26/2017 09:00 AM in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey; the Court also directs an entry of appearance be filed by 9/14/17 on behalf of Southern Management Services, Inc; see order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 8, 2017. (cnn)
September 8, 2017 CERTIFIED MAIL, WITH RETURN RECEIPT ATTACHED, DELIVERED TO U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, for service of #76 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, as to Kinard Crane Butler & Phillips using Certified Mail Article number 70160340000101060083. (cnn)
August 29, 2017 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #74 MOTION for Relief from Voidable Transactions by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc.. (Ratcliff, Brian)
August 29, 2017 Filing 74 MOTION for Relief from Voidable Transactions by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc.. (Ratcliff, Brian)
August 1, 2017 Filing 73 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment . by Weiser-Brown Operating Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Answer to Writ of Garnishment of Weiser-Brown)(Daily, Thomas)
July 31, 2017 Filing 72 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment . by Weiser-Brown Operating Company. (Daily, Thomas)
July 14, 2017 Filing 71 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued (cnn)
July 14, 2017 Filing 70 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc. . (Ratcliff, Brian)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Release of Funds; $5,130.44 in garnished funds to Plaintiff. The garnishment shall remain in effect until the judgment entered against Defendant is paid in full. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 27, 2017. (cnn)
June 9, 2017 Filing 68 MOTION for Release of Funds by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc.. (Ratcliff, Brian)
June 8, 2017 Filing 67 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment re #57 Writ of Garnishment. by Lion Oil Trading & Transportation, LLC. (dated 6/29/16) (cnn)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Show Cause Response within 7 days from entry; see order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 16, 2016. (cnn)
October 14, 2016 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #64 Amended MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for Attorney Fees by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc.. (Ratcliff, Brian)
October 14, 2016 Filing 64 Amended MOTION for Sanctions , MOTION for Attorney Fees by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Financial records)(Ratcliff, Brian)
October 12, 2016 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #62 MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for Attorney Fees by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc.. (Ratcliff, Brian)
October 12, 2016 Filing 62 MOTION for Sanctions , MOTION for Attorney Fees by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Financial Documents)(Ratcliff, Brian)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying #58 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 28, 2016. (cnn)
June 14, 2016 Filing 60 NOTICE by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc. re #53 Application for Writ of Garnishment (Logue, Kimberly)
June 14, 2016 Filing 59 NOTICE by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc. re #53 Application for Writ of Garnishment (Logue, Kimberly)
June 13, 2016 Filing 58 MOTION of David F. Butler to Withdraw as Attorney by Southern Management Services, Inc.. (Butler, David)
June 13, 2016 Filing 57 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued (cnn)
June 13, 2016 Filing 56 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc. . (Ratcliff, Brian)
June 9, 2016 Filing 55 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment re #54 Writ of Garnishment. by Carter Federal Credit Union. (cnn)
May 26, 2016 Filing 54 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued to Carter Federal Credit Union (cnn)
May 26, 2016 Filing 53 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc. . (Ratcliff, Brian)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Compel (see order for specifics). Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 11, 2016. (cnn)
January 28, 2016 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #50 MOTION to Compel by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc.. (Ratcliff, Brian)
January 28, 2016 Filing 50 MOTION to Compel by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Ratcliff, Brian)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Attorney Fees, in favor of Shuler Drilling Company, Inc. against Southern Management Services, Inc. $36,769.25 attorney fees, costs $1,492.90 plus prejudgment and postjudgment interest; see order for further specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 10, 2015. (cnn)
January 5, 2015 Filing 48 RESPONSE to Motion re #46 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pre-Judgment Interest, Post Judgment Interest and Costs filed by Southern Management Services, Inc.. (Butler, David)
December 9, 2014 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #46 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pre-Judgment Interest, Post Judgment Interest and Costs by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc.. (Ratcliff, Brian)
December 9, 2014 Filing 46 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pre-Judgment Interest, Post Judgment Interest and Costs by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Ratcliff, Brian)
November 25, 2014 Filing 45 JUDGMENT: in accordance with #44 Findings of Facts and Conclusions of Law; see order for specifics; **** Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 25, 2014. (cnn)
November 25, 2014 Filing 44 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 25, 2014. (cnn)
November 3, 2014 Filing 43 POST HEARING/TRIAL BRIEF by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc. as directed by the Court . (Ratcliff, Brian)
November 3, 2014 Filing 42 POST HEARING/TRIAL BRIEF by Southern Management Services, Inc. as directed by the Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript Tape 1, #2 Exhibit Transcript Tape 2, #3 Exhibit Transcript Tape 3, #4 Exhibit Transcript Tape 4)(Butler, David)
October 8, 2014 Court Recording of Bench Trial held on 9/29/14, by Court Reporter Felisha Burson, Tape No. FB 14-50, Location of Tape: El Dorado. (cnn)
September 29, 2014 Filing 41 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Susan O. Hickey: Bench Trial held on 9/29/2014. Matter taken under advisement. Parties are directed to submit thier post-trial briefs on or before 11/3/2014. (Felisha Burson-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in El Dorado-2nd Flr) (rwg)
September 26, 2014 Filing 40 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony from Newly Added Witness Jeff Anderson by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc., Superior Well Drilling, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email from Darla Longino dated 9/25/14, #2 Exhibit Excerpts from 8/26/14 deposition of David Disiere)(Ratcliff, Brian)
August 13, 2014 Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines: Bench Trial set for 9/29/2014 09:00 AM in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. (mll)
August 12, 2014 Filing 39 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER Resetting: Bench Trial reset for 9/30/2014 @ 09:00 AM in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 12, 2014. (rwg)
August 11, 2014 Court Recording of Status Conference held on 8/4/14, by Court Reporter Felisha Burson, Tape No. FB 14-40, Location of Tape: El Dorado. (cnn)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete/Authorize Discovery; See order for specifics as to depositions. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 5, 2014. (cnn)
August 4, 2014 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Susan O. Hickey: Motion Hearing held on 8/4/2014 re #35 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Southern Management Services, Inc. (Felisha Burson-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in El Dorado-2nd Flr) (rwg)
July 17, 2014 Filing 37 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial reset for 9/3/2014 @ 09:00 AM in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 17, 2014. (rwg)
July 17, 2014 TEXT ONLY ORDER Setting Hearing on #35 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2014 @ 09:00 AM in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 17, 2014. (rwg)
May 28, 2014 Filing 36 RESPONSE to Motion re #35 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc., Superior Well Drilling, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ratcliff, Brian)
May 23, 2014 Filing 35 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Southern Management Services, Inc.. (Butler, David)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Continue; Trial to be reset at a later date. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 7, 2013. (cnn)
November 7, 2013 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re #32 Second MOTION to Continue Trial filed by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc., Superior Well Drilling, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Ratcliff, Brian)
November 6, 2013 Filing 32 Second MOTION to Continue Trial by Southern Management Services, Inc.. (Butler, David)
October 24, 2013 TEXT ONLY ORDER Setting/Resetting Hearings: Settlement Conference re-set for 10/29/2013 11:30 AM in El Dorado -- 3rd flr (Rm 315) before Honorable Barry A. Bryant.. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 24, 2013. (dkg)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Setting/Resetting Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 11/5/2013 10:00 AM in El Dorado -- 3rd flr (Rm 315) before Honorable Barry A. Bryant.. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 16, 2013. (dkg)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Referral to US Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 16, 2013. (cnn)
October 14, 2013 Filing 29 PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc., Superior Well Drilling, LLC. (Ratcliff, Brian)
October 11, 2013 Filing 28 MOTION for Referral to Mediation (U.S. Magistrate for Settlement Conference) by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc., Superior Well Drilling, LLC. (Ratcliff, Brian)
February 28, 2013 Filing 27 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial reset for the week beginning 11/12/2013 09:00 AM in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 28, 2013. (rwg)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of All Deadlines and Continuance of the Trial Date. July 8, 2013 jury trial is continued. Deadlines imposed by previous scheduling order are lifted until further notice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 26, 2012. (rwg)
November 1, 2012 Filing 25 MOTION to Continue Deadlines and Trial by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc., Superior Well Drilling, LLC. (Ratcliff, Brian)
October 24, 2012 Filing 24 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for the week of 7/8/2013 @ 09:00 AM in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 24, 2012. (rwg)
October 5, 2012 Filing 23 ANSWER to #22 Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc., Superior Well Drilling, LLC.(Ratcliff, Brian)
September 26, 2012 Filing 22 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Superior Well Drilling, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against Shuler Drilling Company, Inc., filed by Southern Management Services, Inc..(cnn)
September 26, 2012 Summons Issued as to Superior Well Drilling, LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. Magistrate Notice/Consent form furnished. (cnn)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Joinder and granting #17 Motion for Leave to File. Defendant shall file its counterclaim and third-party complaint conventionally, on paper, with the clerk's office within seven (7) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 17, 2012. (adw)
August 29, 2012 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION for Leave to File Counterclaim filed by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc.. (Ratcliff, Brian)
August 29, 2012 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION for Joinder Add Additional Party filed by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc.. (Ratcliff, Brian)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Continue. Bench trial set for the week of 10/15/2012 is hereby continued and will be reset at a later date. Deadlines imposed by previous scheduling order are lifted until futher notice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 24, 2012. (rwg)
August 23, 2012 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Counterclaim by Southern Management Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Butler, David)
August 23, 2012 Filing 16 MOTION for Joinder Add Additional Party by Southern Management Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Counterclaim)(Butler, David)
August 21, 2012 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Continue Trial filed by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Ratcliff, Brian)
August 17, 2012 Filing 14 MOTION to Continue Trial by Southern Management Services, Inc.. (Butler, David)
February 9, 2012 Filing 13 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for the week of 10/15/2012 @ 09:00 AM in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 9, 2012. (rwg)
February 7, 2012 Filing 12 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc. and Southern Management Services, Inc (Ratcliff, Brian) Modified on 2/8/2012 to add filer (cnn).
January 29, 2012 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Honorable Robert T. Dawson no longer assigned to the case. (rwg)
October 14, 2011 Filing 11 AMENDED ANSWER to (Second Amended) by Southern Management Services, Inc.. (Butler, David)
October 14, 2011 Filing 10 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct File Second Amended Answer by Southern Management Services, Inc.. (Butler, David)
October 14, 2011 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Answer. Defendant is directed to immediately file its amended answer. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on October 14, 2011. (ms)
August 22, 2011 Filing 9 AMENDED ANSWER re #5 to #3 Complaint by Southern Management Services, Inc.(Butler, David) Modified on 8/23/2011 to create document link and add text (cnn).
August 18, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian H. Ratcliff on behalf of Shuler Drilling Company, Inc.. (Ratcliff, Brian)
August 17, 2011 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting held by 9/16/11 and Rule 26f Report filed by 9/30/2011. Bench Trial set for 9/24/2012 09:00 AM in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Robert T. Dawson. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 17, 2011. (cnn)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Substitute Attorney David F. Buter replacing in place of Douglas M. Carson as attorney for the defendant. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 17, 2011. (cnn)
August 17, 2011 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Southern Management Services, Inc..(Butler, David)
August 17, 2011 Filing 4 Proposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney David F. Butler, Jr. by Southern Management Services, Inc.. (Butler, David)
August 11, 2011 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Southern Management Services, Inc., filed by Shuler Drilling Company, Inc. (originally filed in state court)(cnn)
August 11, 2011 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Southern Management Services, Inc.. (cnn)
August 11, 2011 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Union County Circuit Court, case number CV 2011-0231-6. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 2008190), filed by Southern Management Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shuler Drilling Company, Inc. v. Southern Management Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Southern Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: David F. Butler
Represented By: Steve R. Crane
Represented By: Douglas M. Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Carter Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Weiser-Brown Operating Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Lion Oil Trading & Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Well Drilling, LLC
Represented By: Brian H. Ratcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shuler Drilling Company, Inc.
Represented By: Henry C. Kinslow
Represented By: Kimberly D. Logue
Represented By: Brian H. Ratcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?