Lion Oil Company v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Plaintiff: Lion Oil Company
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency, Lisa P. Jackson and Al Armendariz
Case Number: 1:2011cv01070
Filed: December 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2012 Filing 12 CLERK'S ORDER Dismissing Case re #11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Lion Oil Company. CASE DISMISSED without prejudice. (jn)
May 15, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of by Lion Oil Company (Nestrud, Charles)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Stay litigation for 60 days from date of this order. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 26, 2012. (cnn)
March 23, 2012 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Stay the Litigation by Al Armendariz, Lisa P. Jackson, United States Environmental Protection Agency. (Talbert, Stephanie)
January 23, 2012 CLERK'S FIRST NOTICE re No Service of Process directed to Plaintiff Lion Oil Company. No answer or other responsive pleading has been filed. The file does not reflect a proof of service of the complaint upon the defendant(s). Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(l) requires proof of service to be filed with the court. If service is not perfected on a defendant within 120 days after filing the complaint, a show cause order will issue and the complaint against that defendant is subject to dismissal pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(m). TEXT ONLY ENTRY, NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED (cnn)
January 17, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie J. Talbert on behalf of All Defendants. (Talbert, Stephanie)
December 19, 2011 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tom E. Lindley on behalf of Lion Oil Company. (Lindley, Tom)
December 19, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Higgs on behalf of Lion Oil Company. (Higgs, Steven)
December 19, 2011 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lion Oil Company. (Nestrud, Charles)
December 19, 2011 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Tom E. Lindley and Stephen J. Higgs are each directed to immediately register as CM/ECF users if they have not already done so and enter their appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 19, 2011. (rp)
December 16, 2011 Filing 4 First MOTION for Tom E. Lindley, and Stephen J. Higgs to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lion Oil Company. (Moody, Heather)
December 16, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Moody on behalf of Lion Oil Company. (Moody, Heather)
December 15, 2011 CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiff Lion Oil Company. Complaint #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Heather Moody, Tom Lindley and Stephen Higgs. TEXT ONLY ENTRY, NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (cnn)
December 15, 2011 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Lion Oil Company. (cnn)
December 15, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Al Armendariz, Lisa P. Jackson, United States Environmental Protection Agency ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1000323), filed by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lion Oil Company v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lion Oil Company
Represented By: Stephen J. Higgs
Represented By: Tom E. Lindley
Represented By: Heather Moody
Represented By: Charles R. Nestrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa P. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Armendariz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?