Jones v. Miller et al

Plaintiff: Benjamin Muhammad Jones
Defendant: Thomas Miller, Brian Martin, Mike Warren, P Gonzales, Jason Alexander, Joyce Mitchell, Patrick Patton, Cedric Calbert, Bruce Anderson, Don Hollingsworth, Denise McMilliam, Ron Franklin, Denise Hammock, Charles Patton , Jr, Michelle Weaver, Burt, Ricky Jones, Randy Pete, Mark Danzy, Carolyn Huitt, Mike Jolly, Nevada County, AR, Shirley Patton and Terrence Moore
Case Number: 1:2012cv01071
Filed: June 26, 2012
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2015 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in case 1:12-cv-01071-SOH; 108 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendations re 124 Report and Recommendations. in case 1:12-cv-01071-SOH; case dismissed. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 15, 2015. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01071-SOH, 1:12-cv-01091-SOH-BAB(cnn)
August 5, 2015 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 107 ; granting 63 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 66 Motion for Summary Judgment; claims against separate defendants Carolyn Byrd,Sheila Jackson, James Kitchen, John Burnside and Alice Woods are dismissed with prejudice; Shaun Doe is dismissed from this lawsuit. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 5, 2015. (cnn)
April 3, 2015 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 60 and 96 Plaintiff's Motions for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 3, 2015. (See Order for specifics.) (mfr)
October 3, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Defendants to file a summary judgment motion by December 3, 2014. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 3, 2014. (mll)
July 21, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 52 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS granting 38 MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by Carolyn Simmons, Randy Pete, Rueben Gonzales, Mike Warren, Thomas Miller, Brian Martin, Don Hollingsworth, Mike Jolly, Terrence Moore; separate defendants Brian Martin, Thomas Miller, Mike Warren, Don Hollingsworth, Terrance Moore, Mike Jolly, Ruben Gonzales, Carolyn Simmons, Randy Peek and Mark Danzy are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 21, 2014. (cnn)
May 15, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 47 ; party William Straughn is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 15, 2014. (cnn)
July 1, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; re 11 certain claims dismissed without prejudice (see order for specifics) and separate defendants, Patrick Patton, Dr. Mitchell Weaver (Michelle Weaver), Bruce Anderson, Chuck Lanehart and Mrs. Golly are dismissed. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 1, 2013. (cnn)
June 25, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court TRANSFER ORDER finding that the interest of justice will best be served by transferring this action, the Clerk is hereby directed to immediately transfer this case to the USDC for the Western District of Arkansas, El Dorado Division. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/25/12. (vjt) [Transferred from ared on 6/26/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Muhammad Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedric Calbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise McMilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Hammock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Patton , Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Pete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Danzy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Huitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Jolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada County, AR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrence Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?