Aaron et al v. Summit Health and Rehabilitation, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Betty Aaron, Robin Birden, Barbara Evans, Lasonya Harris, Stacie Hill, Michelle Hubbard, David Kelley, Sharon Langston, Latasha Oliver, Samantha Pace, Hazel Taylor, Stephanie Watson and Laura Wright
Defendant: Summit Health and Rehabilitation, LLC, Progressive Eldercare Services-Bryant, Inc., Courtyard Rehabilitation and Health Center, LLC, Prgressive Eldercare Services-Morrilton, Inc., John Ponthie and SA Eldercare, LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv01112
Filed: December 5, 2012
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2016 282 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 280 Motion to Extend to file motion for settlement ; granting 281 Motion for Settlement approval. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 21, 2016. (cnn)
July 27, 2015 255 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 27, 2015. (mll)
July 7, 2015 250 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER in accordance with Memo Opinion re 249 ; granting 220 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 223 Motion for Summary Judgment; Separate defendants John Ponthie and SA Eldercare are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 7, 2015. (cnn)
June 17, 2015 242 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 232 Motion to Dismiss Ineligible Opt-In Parties Marilyn Anderson; Emmanuel Anigwe; Raylon Baker; Sierra Bennett; Kandice Black;Deborah Bray; Devin Bray; Kimberly Broughton; Doris Cobb; Becky Cox; Vicki Duckworth; Joshua Dunlap; Ama nda Epperson; Shirley Gooden; Crystal Gray; Jaimicia Hegwood; Crystal Jackson; Jaqueline Jackson; Nicole Jackson; Cherese Johnson; Janet Jones; Betty Lawson-Whitfield; Andrea Lemoine; Linda McDaniel; Alethea McHenry; Melissa McPherson; Terra Meadows; Chantel Mills; Erika Mixon; Ashley Morgan; Natalie Parnell; Laura Poe; Ashley Reddick; Amy Suttles; Louella White; and Regina Williams are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 17, 2015. (cnn)
April 24, 2015 210 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 208 and 209 Motion(s) to Dismiss Party Separate Opt-In Plaintiffs; Brandy Cloud, Victoria Moody, Beverly Lewis, Joyce Grant, LaShatia Boswell, Brandie Broughton, Deanque Davis, Laura Jones, Eddie Rogers, Tina Smith, Lillian Tatum, Cynthia Turner, Ramona Wade, Alexandria Wells, Valerie Rhodes, Robert Woods, Jim Brown, Rebecca Turley, and Chrystie Laird claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 24, 2015. (cnn)
March 2, 2015 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 186 , 187 , 188 , 189 , 190 and 191 Motion to Dismiss Party / Opt-in plaintiffs LaSonya Harris, Samantha Pace, Linda George, Patricia Glass, Marie Ogden, Dottie Hill, Brenda Birks, Theresa Davis, Valerie Gill, Stephanie Miller, Yolonda Gill and Lakeshia Lane (without prejudice). Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 2, 2015. (cnn)
March 19, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 59 Motion to Dismiss, as set forth. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 19, 2014. (lw)
August 19, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 Motion to Dismiss; plaintiff's David Kelley and Stephanie Watson claims against all defendants dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 19, 2013. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron et al v. Summit Health and Rehabilitation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Aaron
Represented By: Thomas G. Buchanan, III
Represented By: Susan E Burgess
Represented By: John Terrell Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Birden
Represented By: Thomas G. Buchanan, III
Represented By: Susan E Burgess
Represented By: John Terrell Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Evans
Represented By: Thomas G. Buchanan, III
Represented By: Susan E Burgess
Represented By: John Terrell Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lasonya Harris
Represented By: Thomas G. Buchanan, III
Represented By: Susan E Burgess
Represented By: John Terrell Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacie Hill
Represented By: Thomas G. Buchanan, III
Represented By: Susan E Burgess
Represented By: John Terrell Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Hubbard
Represented By: Thomas G. Buchanan, III
Represented By: Susan E Burgess
Represented By: John Terrell Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kelley
Represented By: Thomas G. Buchanan, III
Represented By: Susan E Burgess
Represented By: John Terrell Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Langston
Represented By: Thomas G. Buchanan, III
Represented By: Susan E Burgess
Represented By: John Terrell Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latasha Oliver
Represented By: Thomas G. Buchanan, III
Represented By: Susan E Burgess
Represented By: John Terrell Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Pace
Represented By: Thomas G. Buchanan, III
Represented By: Susan E Burgess
Represented By: John Terrell Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hazel Taylor
Represented By: Thomas G. Buchanan, III
Represented By: Susan E Burgess
Represented By: John Terrell Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Watson
Represented By: Thomas G. Buchanan, III
Represented By: Susan E Burgess
Represented By: John Terrell Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Wright
Represented By: Thomas G. Buchanan, III
Represented By: Susan E Burgess
Represented By: John Terrell Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Health and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: James Matthew Gary
Represented By: Ashley Rebecca Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Eldercare Services-Bryant, Inc.
Represented By: James Matthew Gary
Represented By: Ashley Rebecca Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtyard Rehabilitation and Health Center, LLC
Represented By: James Matthew Gary
Represented By: Ashley Rebecca Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prgressive Eldercare Services-Morrilton, Inc.
Represented By: James Matthew Gary
Represented By: Ashley Rebecca Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ponthie
Represented By: James Matthew Gary
Represented By: Ashley Rebecca Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SA Eldercare, LLC
Represented By: James Matthew Gary
Represented By: Ashley Rebecca Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?