United States of America v. Lion Oil Company
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Lion Oil Company
Case Number: 1:2013cv01059
Filed: July 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Terminate Consent Decree. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 9, 2013. (cnn)
December 5, 2013 Filing 10 MOTION for Order to Terminate Consent Decree by United States of America. (Robers, Brandon)
September 13, 2013 Filing 9 CONSENT DECREE in favor of United States of America against Lion Oil Company in the amount of $504,000.00 (Civil Penalty plus interest; See decree for further specifics). Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 13, 2013. (cnn) Modified on 9/16/2013 to edit text (cnn).
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Entry of Consent Decree. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 13, 2013. (cnn)
August 29, 2013 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #6 Unopposed Motion to Enter Consent Decree by United States of America. (Robers, Brandon) Modified on 8/30/2013 to add text and document link (mfr).
August 29, 2013 Filing 6 MOTION for Settlement Motion to Enter Consent Decree by United States of America. (Robers, Brandon)
July 15, 2013 Filing 5 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Consent Decree by United States of America. (Robers, Brandon)
July 15, 2013 Filing 4 NOTICE of Settlement Notice of Consent Decree Lodging by United States of America (Robers, Brandon)
July 9, 2013 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished (cnn)
July 9, 2013 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by United States of America. (cnn)
July 9, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lion Oil Company, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Lion Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lion Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Brandon James Robers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?