Lion Oil Company v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA et al
Plaintiff: Lion Oil Company
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Ace American Insurance Company, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, XL Insurance America, Inc., Lexington Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Landmark American Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Torus Speciality Insurance Company and Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987
Case Number: 1:2013cv01071
Filed: October 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: El Dorado Office
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2017 Filing 245 NOTICE OF FILING OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held during Jury Trial held on 10/26-28/16, before Judge Susan O. Hickey. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Felisha Burson, Telephone number 870-677-7075. Tape Number: FB 2015-63. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber. After the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline, it, or a redacted transcript, may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER A Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of the Transcript MUST be filed within 7 calendar days of the filing of the transcript and served manually on the court reporter/transcriber. Redaction Request due 2/13/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/23/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/24/2017. (cnn)
January 23, 2017 Filing 244 NOTICE OF FILING OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Testimony of Kevin O'Toole /Jury Trial held on 10/28/16, before Judge Susan O. Hickey. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Felisha Burson, Telephone number 870-677-7075. Tape Number: FB 2015-63. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber. After the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline, it, or a redacted transcript, may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER A Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of the Transcript MUST be filed within 7 calendar days of the filing of the transcript and served manually on the court reporter/transcriber. Redaction Request due 2/13/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/23/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/24/2017. (cnn)
May 25, 2016 ***Civil Case Terminated; See Order #243 . Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 25, 2016. (cnn)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER re #239 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Lion Oil Company; case dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 25, 2016. (cnn)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER granting #240 Motion to Vacate Court orders - #138 Memorandum Opinion, #139 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #217 Order related to the issue of serviceinterruption coverage and #218 Order related to contingent extra expensecoverage; a separate order of dismissal will be entered. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 25, 2016. (cnn)
March 8, 2016 Filing 241 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #240 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Three Court Rulings (Dkt. Nos. 138-39, 217 and 218 or Alternatively Mark for Non-Publication by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
March 8, 2016 Filing 240 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Three Court Rulings (Dkt. Nos. 138-39, 217 and 218 or Alternatively Mark for Non-Publication by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
March 4, 2016 Filing 239 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Lion Oil Company. (Ratcliff, Brian)
November 4, 2015 Filing 238 JURY VERDICT for Lion Oil Company and against NUFIC of PA, et al. (rwg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2018: #1 Exhibit Signed Verdict) (cnn).
November 4, 2015 Filing 237 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Susan O. Hickey: Jury Trial - Day 7 completed on 11/4/2015. (Felisha Burson-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in El Dorado-2nd Flr) (rwg)
November 4, 2015 Filing 236 NOTICE by Lion Oil Company of Proposed Jury Instructions (cnn)
November 4, 2015 Filing 235 OBJECTION(S) by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. by Insurers' to Lion Oil's Jury Instructions. (Webster, William)
November 4, 2015 Filing 234 NOTICE by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. of filing Insurers' Proposed Special Verdict Form (Webster, William)
November 4, 2015 Filing 233 NOTICE by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. of filing Insurers Proposed Jury Instructions (Webster, William)
November 4, 2015 Filing 232 AFFIDAVIT of William A. Webster filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. re #191 Post Hearing/Trial Brief,,, Relating to Lion Oil's Contingent Extra Expense Claim. (Webster, William)
November 3, 2015 Filing 231 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Susan O. Hickey: Jury Trial - Day 6 held on 11/3/2015. (Felisha Burson-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in El Dorado-2nd Flr) (rwg)
November 3, 2015 Filing 230 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #1 Complaint,,, against Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. , filed by Lion Oil Company. Related document: #1 Complaint,,, filed by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrective Action Order, #2 Exhibit Policy)(Ratcliff, Brian)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER denying #214 Motion for Reconsideration as to #138 Memorandum Opinion and #139 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 3, 2015. (cnn)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER granting #199 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint to conform to the parties stipulation regarding losses; plaintiff given until the end of day to file amended complaint. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 3, 2015. (cnn)
November 3, 2015 Filing 227 AFFIDAVIT of William A. Webster filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. re #225 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Sue and Labor Coverage . (Webster, William)
November 3, 2015 Filing 226 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #225 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Sue and Labor Coverage by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
November 3, 2015 Filing 225 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Sue and Labor Coverage by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
November 2, 2015 Filing 224 RESPONSE to Motion re #214 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Summary Judgment Ruling filed by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Ratcliff, Brian)
November 2, 2015 Filing 223 POST HEARING/TRIAL BRIEF by Lion Oil Company as directed by the Court at the conclusion of the following proceedings: #219 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Lion Oil's Trial Memorandum in Response to Insurers' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law - Additional Coverages. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Unaltered Portions of Unofficial Transcript of Trial Day 3, #2 Exhibit B - Unaltered Portions of Transcript of Deposition of Karen Crespin, #3 Exhibit C - Unaltered Portions of Unofficial Transcript of Trial Day 2, #4 Exhibit D - Unaltered Portions of Unofficial Transcript of Trial Day 1, #5 Exhibit E - Unaltered Portions of Unofficial Transcript of Trial Day 5)(Ratcliff, Brian)
November 2, 2015 Filing 222 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Susan O. Hickey: Jury Trial - Day 5 held on 11/2/2015. (Felisha Burson-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in El Dorado-2nd Flr) (rwg)
November 2, 2015 Filing 221 AFFIDAVIT of William A. Webster filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. in support of #219 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law. (cnn)
November 2, 2015 Filing 220 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #219 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (cnn)
November 2, 2015 Filing 219 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. (cnn)
November 2, 2015 Filing 218 ***VACATED **** See Orders #242 and #243 ORDER plaintiffs Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law is GRANTED; Defendants Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law is DENIED; The policy at issue in this case provides coverage for Contingent Extra Expense. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 2, 2015. (cnn) Modified on 5/26/2016 (cnn).
November 2, 2015 Filing 217 ***VACATED **** See Orders #242 and #243 ORDER denying #200 Motion for Judicial Notice of Certain Dictionary Definitions; motions for judgment as a matter of law regarding service interruption coverage and stacking are DENIED, and Plaintiffs motions regarding these two issues are GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 2, 2015. (cnn) Modified on 5/26/2016 (cnn).
November 1, 2015 Filing 216 AFFIDAVIT of William A. Webster filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. re #214 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Summary Judgment Ruling . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Webster, William)
November 1, 2015 Filing 215 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #214 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Summary Judgment Ruling by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
November 1, 2015 Filing 214 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Summary Judgment Ruling by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
October 30, 2015 Filing 213 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Susan O. Hickey: Hearing Out of Jury Presence held on 10/30/2015. (Felisha Burson-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in El Dorado-2nd Flr) (rwg)
October 29, 2015 Filing 212 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Susan O. Hickey: Jury Trial - Day 4 held on 10/29/2015. (Felisha Burson-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in El Dorado-2nd Flr) (rwg)
October 29, 2015 Filing 211 REPLY to Response to Motion re #199 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint filed by Lion Oil Company. (cnn)
October 29, 2015 Filing 210 REPLY to Response to Motion re #200 MOTION for Judicial Notice of Certain Dictionary Definitions filed by Lion Oil Company. (cnn)
October 28, 2015 Filing 209 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Susan O. Hickey: Jury Trial - Day 3 held on 10/28/2015. (Felisha Burson-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in El Dorado-2nd Flr) (rwg)
October 28, 2015 Filing 208 RESPONSE in Opposition re #200 MOTION for Judicial Notice of Certain Dictionary Definitions filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
October 28, 2015 Filing 207 RESPONSE in Opposition re #199 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,,, to Conform to the Parties' Stipulation Regarding the Measurement of Lion Oil's Alleged Losses filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
October 27, 2015 Filing 206 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Susan O. Hickey: Jury Trial - Day 2 held on 10/27/2015. (Felisha Burson-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in El Dorado-2nd Flr) (rwg)
October 26, 2015 Filing 205 POST HEARING/TRIAL BRIEF by Lion Oil Company as directed by the Court Plaintiff's Bench Memorandum Regarding the Applicability of Contingent Extra Expense Coverage. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit National Union Policy)(Ratcliff, Brian)
October 26, 2015 Filing 204 POST HEARING/TRIAL BRIEF by Lion Oil Company as directed by the Court Plaintiff's Bench Memorandum Regarding the Applicability of Service Interruption Coverage. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit National Union Policy)(Ratcliff, Brian)
October 26, 2015 Filing 203 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Susan O. Hickey: Jury Trial - Day 1 held on 10/26/2015. (Felisha Burson-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in El Dorado-2nd Flr) (rwg)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER regarding designated portions of videotaped depositions of witnesses Karen Crespin, Steve Koetting, and Johnita Jones; see order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 26, 2015. (cnn)
October 26, 2015 Filing 201 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #200 MOTION for Judicial Notice of Certain Dictionary Definitions by Lion Oil Company. (cnn)
October 26, 2015 Filing 200 MOTION for Judicial Notice of Certain Dictionary Definitions by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(cnn)
October 26, 2015 Filing 199 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint to Conform to the Parties' Stipulation Regarding Losses by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(cnn)
October 25, 2015 Filing 198 STIPULATION Regarding Losses by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Regarding Stipulated Losses)(Ratcliff, Brian)
October 25, 2015 Filing 197 STIPULATION of Facts by Lion Oil Company. (Ratcliff, Brian)
October 23, 2015 Filing 196 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles M. Cannizzaro on behalf of All Defendants. (Cannizzaro, Charles)
October 23, 2015 Filing 195 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Churan on behalf of Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Churan, Amy)
October 23, 2015 Filing 194 AFFIDAVIT of William A. Webster filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. re #193 Post Hearing/Trial Brief,,, re Claimed Service Interruption Coverage and Stacking Claim. (Webster, William)
October 23, 2015 Filing 193 POST HEARING/TRIAL BRIEF by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. as directed by the Court at the conclusion of the following proceedings: #169 Telephone Conference, Set Hearings,, re Lion Oil's Claimed Service Interruption Coverage and Stacking Claim. (Webster, William)
October 23, 2015 Filing 192 AFFIDAVIT of William Webster filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. re #191 Post Hearing/Trial Brief,,, Lion Oil's Contingent Extra Expense Claim. (Webster, William)
October 23, 2015 Filing 191 POST HEARING/TRIAL BRIEF by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. as directed by the Court at the conclusion of the following proceedings: #169 Telephone Conference, Set Hearings,, re Lion Oil's Contingent Extra Expense Claim. (Webster, William)
October 23, 2015 Filing 190 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Susan O. Hickey: Final Pretrial Conference held on 10/23/2015. (Felisha Burson-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in El Dorado-2nd Flr) (rwg)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER denying #142 Motion in Limine. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 23, 2015. (cnn)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER denying #154 Motion in Limine. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 22, 2015. (cnn)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #152 Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony or Comments Concerning Issues Resolved by the Court's Grant of Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 21, 2015. (rwg)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER denying without prejudice #150 Motion in Limine to Exclude Extrinsic Evidence Offered to Contradict or Vary the Unambiguous Terms of the Insurance Policies. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 21, 2015. (rwg)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER denying #171 Motion to Strike Demand for Twelve Person Jury. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 21, 2015. (cnn)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #140 Motion in Limine as to Any Reference of Previous Daubert Challenge to Tom Baker. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 21, 2015. (cnn)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER denying #145 Motion in Limine to Exclude the Opinions of Tom Dollar. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 21, 2015. (cnn)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER denying #156 Motion in Limine. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 20, 2015. (mll)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting #148 Motion in Limine. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 20, 2015. (mll)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #101 Motion to Exclude. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 20, 2015. (mll)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #93 Motion in Limine. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 20, 2015. (mll)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER denying as moot #90 Motion to Exclude Expert Opinion of Dr. Ashok Saxena. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 20, 2015. (mll)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER denying #87 Motion to Disqualify Greg Deimling as an Expert and to ExcludeHis Entire Expert Opinion. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 20, 2015. (cnn)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER denying #99 Motion to Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony of Tom Baker. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 20, 2015. (cnn)
October 14, 2015 Filing 175 RESPONSE to Motion re #171 MOTION to Strike #170 Jury Demand,, for Twelve Person Jury filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Churan, Amy)
October 14, 2015 Filing 174 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Jury Venire List. (cnn)
October 9, 2015 Filing 173 PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Churan, Amy)
September 30, 2015 Filing 172 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #171 MOTION to Strike #170 Jury Demand,, by Lion Oil Company. (Ratcliff, Brian)
September 30, 2015 Filing 171 MOTION to Strike #170 Jury Demand,, by Lion Oil Company. (Ratcliff, Brian)
September 25, 2015 Filing 170 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Simpson, James)
September 24, 2015 Filing 169 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Susan O. Hickey: Telephone Conference held on 9/24/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2015 @ 10:00 AM in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. (Felisha Burson-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in El Dorado-2nd Flr) (rwg)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER denying #127 Motion to Amend/Modify Final Scheduling Order. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 23, 2015. (cnn)
September 21, 2015 Filing 167 RESPONSE in Opposition re #145 MOTION in Limine #4 to Exclude the Opinions of Tom Dollar filed by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Geoffrey J. Greeves In Support of Plaintiff Lion Oil Company's Opposition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A Deposition Exceprt, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B Deposition Excerpt, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C Deposition Excerpt, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D Letter, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E Letter)(Ratcliff, Brian)
September 21, 2015 Filing 166 RESPONSE in Opposition re #142 MOTION in Limine #3 to Exclude any Evidence That Lion Oil's Lost Earnings Exceed $25.0 Million filed by Lion Oil Company. (Ratcliff, Brian)
September 21, 2015 Filing 165 RESPONSE in Opposition re #140 MOTION in Limine #2 to Exclude any Reference of Previous Daubert Challenge to Tom Baker filed by Lion Oil Company. (Ratcliff, Brian)
September 21, 2015 Filing 164 AFFIDAVIT of William A. Webster filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. re #163 Response to Motion,,, . (Webster, William)
September 21, 2015 Filing 163 RESPONSE to Motion re #154 MOTION in Limine #4 To Exclude Testimony or Evidence Relating to Northline Shutdowns After March 19, 2013 filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
September 21, 2015 Filing 162 RESPONSE to Motion re #152 MOTION in Limine #3 To Exclude Testimony or Comments Concerning Issues Resolved By the Court's Grant of Summary Judgment filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
September 21, 2015 Filing 161 RESPONSE to Motion re #150 MOTION in Limine #2 To Exclude Extrinsic Evidence Offered to Contradict or Vary the Unambiguous Terms of the Insurance Policies filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
September 21, 2015 Filing 160 AFFIDAVIT of William A. Webster filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. re #159 Response to Motion,,, . (Webster, William)
September 21, 2015 Filing 159 RESPONSE to Motion re #156 MOTION in Limine #5 To Exclude Testimony or Evidence Relating to the Temporary and Partial Operation of the Northline in May 2012 filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
September 21, 2015 Filing 158 RESPONSE to Motion re #148 MOTION in Limine #1 To Exclude Testimony or Evidence Relating to Pillsbury's Pre-Suit Coverage Opinion filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
September 15, 2015 TEXT ONLY ORDER Resetting Hearing: Due to an unexpected conflict in the Court's schedule the Telephone Status Conference is reset for 9/24/2015 @ 10:00 AM in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 15, 2015. (rwg)
September 14, 2015 Filing 157 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #156 MOTION in Limine #5 To Exclude Testimony or Evidence Relating to the Temporary and Partial Operation of the Northline in May 2012 by Lion Oil Company. (Ratcliff, Brian)
September 14, 2015 Filing 156 MOTION in Limine #5 To Exclude Testimony or Evidence Relating to the Temporary and Partial Operation of the Northline in May 2012 by Lion Oil Company. (Ratcliff, Brian)
September 14, 2015 Filing 155 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #154 MOTION in Limine #4 To Exclude Testimony or Evidence Relating to Northline Shutdowns After March 19, 2013 by Lion Oil Company. (Ratcliff, Brian)
September 14, 2015 Filing 154 MOTION in Limine #4 To Exclude Testimony or Evidence Relating to Northline Shutdowns After March 19, 2013 by Lion Oil Company. (Ratcliff, Brian)
September 14, 2015 Filing 153 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #152 MOTION in Limine #3 To Exclude Testimony or Comments Concerning Issues Resolved By the Court's Grant of Summary Judgment by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Review and Analysis of Failure of 22" Diameter Crude Oil Pipeline, #2 Exhibit Expert Report of Tom Baker, #3 Exhibit Depostition Testimony (Excerpt) of Tom Baker)(Ratcliff, Brian)
September 14, 2015 Filing 152 MOTION in Limine #3 To Exclude Testimony or Comments Concerning Issues Resolved By the Court's Grant of Summary Judgment by Lion Oil Company. (Ratcliff, Brian)
September 14, 2015 Filing 151 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #150 MOTION in Limine #2 To Exclude Extrinsic Evidence Offered to Contradict or Vary the Unambiguous Terms of the Insurance Policies by Lion Oil Company. (Ratcliff, Brian)
September 14, 2015 Filing 150 MOTION in Limine #2 To Exclude Extrinsic Evidence Offered to Contradict or Vary the Unambiguous Terms of the Insurance Policies by Lion Oil Company. (Ratcliff, Brian)
September 14, 2015 Filing 149 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #148 MOTION in Limine #1 To Exclude Testimony or Evidence Relating to Pillsbury's Pre-Suit Coverage Opinion by Lion Oil Company. (Ratcliff, Brian)
September 14, 2015 Filing 148 MOTION in Limine #1 To Exclude Testimony or Evidence Relating to Pillsbury's Pre-Suit Coverage Opinion by Lion Oil Company. (Ratcliff, Brian)
September 14, 2015 Filing 147 AFFIDAVIT of William A. Webster filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company re #145 MOTION in Limine #4 to Exclude the Opinions of Tom Dollar . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C")(Webster, William)
September 14, 2015 Filing 146 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #145 MOTION in Limine #4 to Exclude the Opinions of Tom Dollar by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
September 14, 2015 Filing 145 MOTION in Limine #4 to Exclude the Opinions of Tom Dollar by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
September 14, 2015 Filing 144 AFFIDAVIT of William A.,Webster filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. re #142 MOTION in Limine #3 to Exclude any Evidence That Lion Oil's Lost Earnings Exceed $25.0 Million . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B")(Webster, William)
September 14, 2015 Filing 143 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #142 MOTION in Limine #3 to Exclude any Evidence That Lion Oil's Lost Earnings Exceed $25.0 Million by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company. (Webster, William)
September 14, 2015 Filing 142 MOTION in Limine #3 to Exclude any Evidence That Lion Oil's Lost Earnings Exceed $25.0 Million by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
September 14, 2015 Filing 141 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #140 MOTION in Limine #2 to Exclude any Reference of Previous Daubert Challenge to Tom Baker by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
September 14, 2015 Filing 140 MOTION in Limine #2 to Exclude any Reference of Previous Daubert Challenge to Tom Baker by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
September 14, 2015 TEXT ONLY ORDER Setting Hearing: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/23/2015 @ 01:30 PM in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 14, 2015. (rwg)
September 10, 2015 Filing 139 ***VACATED **** See Orders #242 and #243 ORDER for the reasons set forth in the #138 Memorandum Opinion, Defendants #68 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P.56(f)(1), as to the two exclusion issues, summary judgment is GRANTED in favor of Plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 10, 2015. (lw) Modified on 5/26/2016 (cnn).
September 10, 2015 Filing 138 ***VACATED **** See Orders #242 and #243 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 10, 2015. (lw) Modified on 5/26/2016 (cnn).
September 9, 2015 Filing 137 PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Churan, Amy)
September 4, 2015 Filing 136 PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Webster, William)
September 1, 2015 Filing 135 OBJECTIONS to #132 Pre-Trial Disclosure Sheet by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit LION OILS OBJECTIONS TO INSURERS EXHIBITS)(Greathouse, Julie)
August 31, 2015 Filing 134 PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Amended Pre-Trial Exhibit List)(Greathouse, Julie)
August 31, 2015 Filing 133 OBJECTIONS to #103 Pre-Trial Disclosure Sheet by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
August 25, 2015 Filing 132 PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Amended Pretrial Disclosure Sheet)(Webster, William)
August 23, 2015 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #131 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Charles M. Cannizzaro is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 23, 2015. (ljl)
August 21, 2015 Filing 131 MOTION for Attorney Charles M. Cannizzaro to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number 1000593) by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. (cnn)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER denying #97 Motion to Compel; #117 granting Motion for Leave to file reply (attached reply taken into consideration ruling on motion to compel). Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 4, 2015. (cnn)
July 30, 2015 Filing 129 RESPONSE in Opposition re #127 MOTION to Amend/Correct Modify the Final Scheduling Order for the Limited Purpose of Taking Thomas Dollar's Deposition filed by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Ratcliff, Brian)
July 17, 2015 Filing 128 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #127 MOTION to Amend/Correct Modify the Final Scheduling Order for the Limited Purpose of Taking Thomas Dollar's Deposition by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Churan, Amy)
July 17, 2015 Filing 127 MOTION to Amend/Correct Modify the Final Scheduling Order for the Limited Purpose of Taking Thomas Dollar's Deposition by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Churan, Amy)
July 17, 2015 TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #125 Motion for Leave to file Reply. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 17, 2015. (ljl)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting #121 Motion to Quash Defendants Untimely Non-PartySubpoenas. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 16, 2015. (cnn)
July 16, 2015 Filing 125 MOTION for Leave to to File Motion to Quash Reply by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply In Support of Motion to Quash, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Reply in Support of Motion to Quash)(Greathouse, Julie)
July 14, 2015 Filing 124 RESPONSE in Opposition re #121 Emergency MOTION to Quash PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANTS UNTIMELY NON-PARTY SUBPOENAS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO MODIFY THE SUBPOENAS, AND FOR SANCTIONS, FEES AND COSTS filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of William A. Webster in Support of Insurers' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Quash Subpoenas, #2 Exhibit A - E-mail Chain, #3 Exhibit B - E-mail Chain, #4 Exhibit C - Letter, #5 Exhibit D - Defendants' Answers to Interrogatories, #6 Exhibit E - Excerpts from Deposition of Andrew Ernst, #7 Exhibit F - E-mail, #8 Exhibit G - WKA Report No. 2, #9 Exhibit H - E-mail Chain, #10 Exhibit I - E-mail Chain, #11 Exhibit J - E-mail, #12 Exhibit K - Plaintiff's Response to Requests for Production of Documents)(Webster, William)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER re #121 Emergency MOTION to Quash filed by Lion Oil Company; defendants direct to respond to motion by 7/14/15. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 7, 2015. (cnn)
July 2, 2015 Filing 122 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #121 Emergency MOTION to Quash PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANTS UNTIMELY NON-PARTY SUBPOENAS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO MODIFY THE SUBPOENAS, AND FOR SANCTIONS, FEES AND COSTS by Lion Oil Company. (Greathouse, Julie)
July 2, 2015 Filing 121 Emergency MOTION to Quash PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANTS UNTIMELY NON-PARTY SUBPOENAS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO MODIFY THE SUBPOENAS, AND FOR SANCTIONS, FEES AND COSTS by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2, #3 Ex. 3, #4 Ex. 4, #5 Ex. 5, #6 Ex. 6)(Greathouse, Julie)
May 29, 2015 Filing 120 AFFIDAVIT filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. re #119 Memorandum Brief in Support,,, #118 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, Or in the Alternative, Insurers' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Churan, Amy)
May 29, 2015 Filing 119 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #118 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, or in the Alternative, Insurers' Sur-Reply by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Churan, Amy)
May 29, 2015 Filing 118 RESPONSE in Opposition re #117 MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Opposition To Insurers' Response To Lion Oil's Motion To Compel or in the Alternative, Insurers' Sur-Reply filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Churan, Amy)
May 8, 2015 Filing 117 MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Opposition To Insurers' Response To Lion Oil's Motion To Compel by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply in Opposition)(Ratcliff, Brian)
April 24, 2015 Filing 116 AFFIDAVIT filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. re #115 Response to Motion,,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit "D", #5 Exhibit "E", #6 Exhibit "F", #7 Exhibit "G", #8 Exhibit "H", #9 Exhibit "I", #10 Exhibit "J", #11 Exhibit "K", #12 Exhibit "L", #13 Exhibit "M", #14 Exhibit "N")(Churan, Amy)
April 24, 2015 Filing 115 RESPONSE to Motion re #97 MOTION to Compel Lion Oil Company's Motion to Compel Further Production of Documents filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Churan, Amy)
March 30, 2015 Filing 114 RESPONSE to Motion re #90 MOTION to Exclude Opinion of Dr. Ashok Saxena (Daubert Motion #2) Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Daubert Motion #2 to Exclude Expert Opinion of Saxena Regarding the 2007 In-Line Inspection filed by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-A)(Ratcliff, Brian)
March 30, 2015 Filing 113 RESPONSE to Motion re #87 MOTION to Disqualify Greg Deimling as Expert (Daubert Motion #1) Lion Oil Company's Opposition to Defendants' Daubert Motion #1 to Disqualify Deimling As An Expert And Exclude His Entire Expert Opinion filed by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 1-C, #5 Exhibit 1-D)(Ratcliff, Brian)
March 30, 2015 Filing 112 RESPONSE to Motion re #93 MOTION in Limine #1 to Exclude Testimony of O'Toole, Byrd & Saxena Plaintiff's Response to Def Motion In Limine #1 to Exclude the Testimony of O'Toole, Byrd and Saxena filed by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 1-C, #5 Exhibit 1-D, #6 Exhibit 1-E, #7 Exhibit 1-F, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 2-A, #10 Exhibit 2-B-1, #11 Exhibit 2-B-2, #12 Exhibit 2-B-3)(Ratcliff, Brian)
March 27, 2015 Filing 111 AFFIDAVIT of William A. Webster filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. re #110 Response to Motion,,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B")(Webster, William)
March 27, 2015 Filing 110 RESPONSE to Motion re #101 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinion Testimony of George J Fox III filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
March 27, 2015 Filing 109 AFFIDAVIT of William A. Webster filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. re #108 Response to Motion,,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B")(Webster, William)
March 27, 2015 Filing 108 RESPONSE to Motion re #99 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinion Testimony of Tom Baker filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #106 Motion to Extend deadlines; see order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 10, 2015. (cnn)
March 9, 2015 Filing 106 MOTION to Extend Joint Motion to Extend Response Deadlines by Lion Oil Company. (Greathouse, Julie)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER OF CONTINUANCE, sua sponte. Jury Trial is reset for 10/26/2015 @ 09:00 AM in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. See Order for Specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 3, 2015. (rwg)
March 3, 2015 Filing 104 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #90 MOTION to Exclude Opinion of Dr. Ashok Saxena (Daubert Motion #2) to Replace Docket No. 91 by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
March 2, 2015 Filing 103 PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pretrial Exhibit List)(Ratcliff, Brian)
March 2, 2015 Filing 102 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #101 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinion Testimony of George J Fox III by Lion Oil Company. (Ratcliff, Brian)
March 2, 2015 Filing 101 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinion Testimony of George J Fox III by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Expert Report of George Fox, #2 Exhibit B - excerpts of Fox Deposition)(Ratcliff, Brian)
March 2, 2015 Filing 100 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #99 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinion Testimony of Tom Baker by Lion Oil Company. (Ratcliff, Brian)
March 2, 2015 Filing 99 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinion Testimony of Tom Baker by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Ratcliff, Brian)
March 2, 2015 Filing 98 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #97 MOTION to Compel Lion Oil Company's Motion to Compel Further Production of Documents Lion Oil Company's Brief in Support of Its Motion to Compel Further Production of Documents by Lion Oil Company. (Ratcliff, Brian)
March 2, 2015 Filing 97 MOTION to Compel Lion Oil Company's Motion to Compel Further Production of Documents by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Catania Depo Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B - Eannarelli Depo Excerpts, #3 Exhibit C - Def Supplemental Initial Disclosures, #4 Exhibit D - Privilege Log, #5 Exhibit E - Cast of Characters, #6 Exhibit F - COR to Lori Caltagirone, #7 Exhibit G -COR to Lori Caltagirone, #8 Exhibit H - Feb 20 Meet and Confer Letter, #9 Exhibit I - March 2 Meet and Confer Email, #10 Exhibit J- March 2 Meet and Confer Email)(Ratcliff, Brian)
March 2, 2015 Filing 96 PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
March 2, 2015 Filing 95 AFFIDAVIT filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. re #93 MOTION in Limine #1 to Exclude Testimony of O'Toole, Byrd & Saxena . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through E)(Webster, William)
March 2, 2015 Filing 94 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #93 MOTION in Limine #1 to Exclude Testimony of O'Toole, Byrd & Saxena by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
March 2, 2015 Filing 93 MOTION in Limine #1 to Exclude Testimony of O'Toole, Byrd & Saxena by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
March 2, 2015 Filing 92 AFFIDAVIT filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. re #90 MOTION to Exclude Opinion of Dr. Ashok Saxena (Daubert Motion #2) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(Webster, William)
March 2, 2015 Filing 91 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #90 MOTION to Exclude Opinion of Dr. Ashok Saxena (Daubert Motion #2) by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
March 2, 2015 Filing 90 MOTION to Exclude Opinion of Dr. Ashok Saxena (Daubert Motion #2) by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
March 2, 2015 Filing 89 AFFIDAVIT filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. re #87 MOTION to Disqualify Greg Deimling as Expert (Daubert Motion #1) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through C)(Webster, William)
March 2, 2015 Filing 88 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #87 MOTION to Disqualify Greg Deimling as Expert (Daubert Motion #1) by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
March 2, 2015 Filing 87 MOTION to Disqualify Greg Deimling as Expert (Daubert Motion #1) by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #81 Motion for Leave to file Sur-reply; see order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 18, 2015. (cnn)
February 6, 2015 Filing 85 NOTICE by All Defendants of Change of Firm Name and E-mail Addresses (Churan, Amy)
February 6, 2015 Filing 84 RESPONSE in Opposition re #81 MOTION for Leave to Lion Oil Co's Motion for Leave to FIle Sur-Reply in Response to Defendants' Reply filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Response to Sur-Reply)(Webster, William)
February 5, 2015 Filing 83 AFFIDAVIT of William A. Webster filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. re #68 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Second Supplemental Affidavit of William A. Webster in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O - Excerpts from Deposition of Michael E. Casey)(Webster, William)
February 5, 2015 Filing 82 RESPONSE to Motion re #81 MOTION for Leave to Lion Oil Co's Motion for Leave to FIle Sur-Reply in Response to Defendants' Reply filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Response to Lion Oil Company's Sur-Reply in Response to Defendants' Reply)(Webster, William)
February 4, 2015 Filing 81 MOTION for Leave to Lion Oil Co's Motion for Leave to FIle Sur-Reply in Response to Defendants' Reply by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sur-Reply, #2 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Greeves, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Ratcliff, Brian)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER re #79 Sur-Reply, filed by Lion Oil Company is stricken; permission from the Court is required. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 4, 2015. (cnn)
February 2, 2015 Filing 79 ***STRICKEN*** see order #80 SUR-REPLY by Lion Oil Company re #76 Reply to Response to Motion,,, Lion Oil Co's Sur-Reply in Response to Defendants' Reply. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Ratcliff, Brian) Modified on 2/4/2015 (cnn).
January 23, 2015 Filing 78 AFFIDAVIT of William A. Webster filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. re #76 Reply to Response to Motion,,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K - Pages from Deposition of Johnita Jones, #2 Exhibit L - Pages from Deposition of William R. Byrd, #3 Exhibit M - Pages from Deposition of Steve Koetting, #4 Exhibit N - Pages from Deposition of Gregory G. Deimling)(Webster, William)
January 23, 2015 Filing 77 AFFIDAVIT of Michael E. Casey filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. re #76 Reply to Response to Motion,,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Failure Analysis & Prevention, Inc. Report)(Webster, William)
January 23, 2015 Filing 76 REPLY to Response to Motion re #68 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
January 22, 2015 Filing 75 MOTION for Attorney Jonathan D. Mutch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number 1000553) by defendants. (cnn)
January 22, 2015 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #75 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jonathan D. Mutch is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 22, 2015. (ljl)
January 14, 2015 Filing 74 STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of #73 Response to Motion,,,, Lion Oil Co's Statement of Material Facts in Dispute by Lion Oil Company. (Ratcliff, Brian)
January 14, 2015 Filing 73 RESPONSE to Motion re #68 MOTION for Summary Judgment Lion Oil Co's Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B-1, #4 Exhibit 1-B-2, #5 Exhibit 1-B-3, #6 Exhibit 1-B-4, #7 Exhibit 1-C, #8 Exhibit 1-D, #9 Exhibit 1-E-1, #10 Exhibit 1-E-2, #11 Exhibit 1-E-3, #12 Exhibit 1-F, #13 Exhibit 1-G, #14 Exhibit 1-H-1, #15 Exhibit 1-H-2, #16 Exhibit 1-H-3, #17 Exhibit 1-I, #18 Exhibit 1-J, #19 Exhibit 1-K, #20 Exhibit 1-L-1, #21 Exhibit 1-L-2, #22 Exhibit 1-L-3, #23 Exhibit 1-L-4, #24 Exhibit 1-L-5, #25 Exhibit 1-L-6, #26 Exhibit 1-L-7, #27 Exhibit 1-L-8, #28 Exhibit 1-L-9, #29 Exhibit 1-L-10, #30 Exhibit 1-L-11, #31 Exhibit 1-L-12, #32 Exhibit 1-L-13, #33 Exhibit 1-M, #34 Exhibit 2, #35 Exhibit 2-A, #36 Exhibit 3, #37 Exhibit 3-A, #38 Exhibit 3-B, #39 Exhibit 3-C-1, #40 Exhibit 3-C-2)(Ratcliff, Brian)
December 30, 2014 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #72 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's response is due on January 14, 2015. Defendants' reply is due on January 23, 2015. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 30, 2014. (ljl)
December 29, 2014 Filing 72 MOTION to Extend Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment by Lion Oil Company. (Greathouse, Julie)
December 22, 2014 Filing 71 AFFIDAVIT filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. re #68 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #70 Statement of Facts,,, #69 Memorandum Brief in Support,,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Webster, William)
December 22, 2014 Filing 70 STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of #68 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
December 22, 2014 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #68 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
December 22, 2014 Filing 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #66 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order; see order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 3, 2014. (cnn)
October 31, 2014 Filing 66 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #56 Final Scheduling Order by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Lion Oil Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Churan, Amy)
August 26, 2014 Filing 65 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 26, 2014. (cnn)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #63 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order as set forth. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 18, 2014. (lw)
July 30, 2014 Filing 63 MOTION to Amend/Correct Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Greathouse, Julie)
July 30, 2014 Filing 62 MOTION for Protective Order Agreed Protective Order by Lion Oil Company. (Greathouse, Julie)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #57 Motion Seeking Relief to Facilitate Efficient Depositions. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 29, 2014. (cnn)
July 28, 2014 Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION for ReliefPlaintiff's Motion Seeking Relief to Facilitate Efficient Depositions (Memorandum in Opposition) filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - E-mail dated July 22, 2014 from William A. Webster to Michael B. Heister, #2 Exhibit 2 - E-mail dated July 15, 2014 from William A. Webster to Geoffrey J. Greeves)(Webster, William)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER directing defendants to respond to motion seeking relief to facilitate efficient depositions by 5pm Monday, 7/28/14. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 25, 2014. (cnn)
July 24, 2014 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #57 MOTION for ReliefPlaintiff's Motion Seeking Relief to Facilitate Efficient Depositions by Lion Oil Company. (Greathouse, Julie)
July 24, 2014 Filing 57 MOTION for ReliefPlaintiff's Motion Seeking Relief to Facilitate Efficient Depositions by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Subpoena, #2 Exhibit B- Chain Email 6-18-14, #3 Exhibit C- Notice of Subpoena, #4 Exhibit D - Chain Email 7-21-14, #5 Exhibit E- Email 7-23-14, #6 Exhibit F-Chain Email 7-22-14, #7 Exhibit G - Ltr dated 7-21-14)(Greathouse, Julie)
June 10, 2014 Filing 56 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/30/2015 @ 09:00 AM in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 10, 2014. (rwg)
April 14, 2014 Filing 55 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William)
March 19, 2014 Filing 54 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be held by 5/5/2014. Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 5/30/2014. Jury Trial set for the week of 2/9/2015 in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 19, 2014. (rwg)
March 7, 2014 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian H. Ratcliff on behalf of Lion Oil Company. (Ratcliff, Brian)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Withdraw Motion; Motion #23 to Dismiss or in the alternative to Stay is withdrawn. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 6, 2014. (cnn)
February 6, 2014 TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #45 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Stay. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 6, 2014. (ljl)
January 29, 2014 Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Churan, Amy)
January 27, 2014 Filing 50 MOTION to Withdraw #23 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Webster, William) Modified on 1/28/2014 to edit filer information (mfr).
January 27, 2014 Filing 49 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company,National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc..(Webster, William) Modified on 1/28/2014 to edit filer information (mfr).
January 16, 2014 Filing 48 NOTICE by Lion Oil Company Notice of Tennessee Opinion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order, #2 Exhibit B - Memorandum)(Greathouse, Julie)
December 31, 2013 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Stay (Docket No. 23) filed by Lion Oil Company. (Greathouse, Julie)
December 17, 2013 Filing 46 NOTICE by All Defendants re #45 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Stay #23 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Supplemental Memorandum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Opp to Motion to Enjoin, #2 Exhibit Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue, #3 Exhibit Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue)(Churan, Amy) Modified on 12/18/2013 to create document link (cnn).
December 17, 2013 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Stay #23 by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Lion Oil Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Churan, Amy) Modified on 12/18/2013 to create document link (cnn).
December 17, 2013 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey J. Greeves on behalf of Lion Oil Company. (Greeves, Geoffrey)
December 17, 2013 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Gillon on behalf of Lion Oil Company. (Gillon, Peter)
December 17, 2013 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent E. Morgan on behalf of Lion Oil Company. (Morgan, Vincent)
December 17, 2013 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Vernon C. Thompson on behalf of Lion Oil Company. (Thompson, Vernon)
December 10, 2013 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint,,, Sur-Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Or In The Alternative Stay filed by Lion Oil Company. (Greathouse, Julie)
December 10, 2013 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #39 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply. Plaintiff must file its Sur-Reply on or before December 13, 2013. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 10, 2013. (ljl)
December 6, 2013 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Or In the Alternative Stay by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sur-Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Stay)(Greathouse, Julie)
November 27, 2013 Filing 38 NOTICE by Lion Oil Company of Order in Lexington Insurance Company, Et Al v. Lion Oil Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Greathouse, Julie)
November 21, 2013 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint,,, Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(3) or in the Alternative Stay filed by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Filed in USDC Middle District of Tennessee, Civil Action No.: 3:13-cv-01054-AAT) (Webster, William) Modified on 11/22/2013 to edit text (cnn).
November 21, 2013 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #36 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Defendants must file their reply on or before November 27, 2013. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 21, 2013. (ljl)
November 20, 2013 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Response in Opposition to Insurers' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(3) or in the Alternative Stay #23 Notice of Motion by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Reply in Support of Insurers' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(3) or in the Alternative Stay (Webster, William) Modified on 11/21/2013 to create document link (cnn).
November 8, 2013 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint,,, filed by Lion Oil Company. (Greathouse, Julie)
November 6, 2013 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Amy M. Churan is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if she has not already done so and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 6, 2013. (ljl)
November 6, 2013 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. William A. Webster is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 6, 2013. (ljl)
November 5, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin A. Kasten on behalf of Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Kasten, Martin)
November 5, 2013 Filing 33 DISREGARD*** (Wrong PDF Attached) NOTICE of Appearance by Martin A. Kasten on behalf of Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Kasten, Martin) Modified on 11/5/2013 (cnn).
November 5, 2013 Filing 32 MOTION for Willaim A. Webster to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ( Application fee received $ 100, receipt number 1000471) by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (cnn)
November 5, 2013 Filing 31 MOTION for Amy M. Churan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ( Application fee received $ 100, receipt number 1000470) by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. (cnn)
October 29, 2013 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Lion Oil Company. Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company served on 10/15/2013, answer due 11/5/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Errata B)(Greathouse, Julie)
October 29, 2013 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Lion Oil Company. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA served on 10/15/2013, answer due 11/5/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Greathouse, Julie)
October 29, 2013 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Lion Oil Company. Lexington Insurance Company served on 10/15/2013, answer due 11/5/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Greathouse, Julie)
October 29, 2013 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Lion Oil Company. Arch Insurance Company served on 10/15/2013, answer due 11/5/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Greathouse, Julie)
October 29, 2013 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Lion Oil Company. XL Insurance America, Inc. served on 10/15/2013, answer due 11/5/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Greathouse, Julie)
October 29, 2013 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Lion Oil Company. Ace American Insurance Company served on 10/15/2013, answer due 11/5/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Greathouse, Julie)
October 29, 2013 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Lion Oil Company. Ace American Insurance Company served on 10/14/2013, answer due 11/4/2013; Arch Insurance Company served on 10/14/2013, answer due 11/4/2013; Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited served on 10/14/2013, answer due 11/4/2013; Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987 served on 10/14/2013, answer due 11/4/2013; Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084 served on 10/14/2013, answer due 11/4/2013; Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000 served on 10/14/2013, answer due 11/4/2013; Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin served on 10/14/2013, answer due 11/4/2013; Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183 served on 10/14/2013, answer due 11/4/2013; Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC served on 10/14/2013, answer due 11/4/2013; Landmark American Insurance Company served on 10/14/2013, answer due 11/4/2013; National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA served on 10/14/2013, answer due 11/4/2013; Torus Speciality Insurance Company served on 10/14/2013, answer due 11/4/2013; XL Insurance America, Inc. served on 10/14/2013, answer due 11/4/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Greathouse, Julie)
October 29, 2013 Filing 23 ***Withdrawn per Order #52 2/6/14 *** MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Stay AND BRIEF re #1 Complaint,,, by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Simpson, James) Modified on 10/29/2013 to add text(cnn). Modified on 2/6/2014 (cnn).
October 28, 2013 Filing 22 DISREGARD*** (attorney to refile as service of process) AFFIDAVIT of Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint filed by Lion Oil Company Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Greathouse, Julie) Modified on 10/29/2013 (cnn).
October 28, 2013 Filing 21 DISREGARD*** (attorney to refile as service of process) AFFIDAVIT of Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint filed by Lion Oil Company Arch Insurance Company/The Corporation Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Greathouse, Julie) Modified on 10/29/2013 (cnn).
October 28, 2013 Filing 20 DISREGARD*** (attorney to refile as service of process) AFFIDAVIT of Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint filed by Lion Oil Company XL Insurance America Inc/The Corporation Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Greathouse, Julie) Modified on 10/29/2013 (cnn).
October 28, 2013 Filing 19 DISREGARD*** (attorney to refile as service of process) AFFIDAVIT of Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint filed by Lion Oil Company ACE American Insurance Company/The Corporation Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Greathouse, Julie) Modified on 10/29/2013 (cnn).
October 28, 2013 Filing 18 DISREGARD*** (attorney to refile as service of process) AFFIDAVIT of Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint filed by Lion Oil Company Arkansas Insurance Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Greathouse, Julie) Modified on 10/29/2013 (cnn).
October 28, 2013 Filing 17 DISREGARD*** (attorney to refile as service of process) AFFIDAVIT of Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint filed by Lion Oil Company Mendes & Mount, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Greathouse, Julie) Modified on 10/29/2013 (cnn).
October 25, 2013 Filing 16 NOTICE by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Simpson, James)
October 25, 2013 Filing 15 DISREGARD*** (Attorney to refile correctly as a Motion) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc..(Simpson, James) Modified on 10/29/2013 (cnn).
October 25, 2013 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Simpson on behalf of Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Simpson, James)
October 22, 2013 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Peter M. Gillon is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 22, 2013. (ljl)
October 22, 2013 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Vernon C. Thompson is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 22, 2013. (ljl)
October 22, 2013 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Geoffrey J. Greeves is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 22, 2013. (ljl)
October 22, 2013 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Vincent E. Morgan is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he/she has not already done so and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 22, 2013. (ljl)
October 21, 2013 Filing 13 MOTION for Vincent E. Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ( Application fee received $ 100, receipt number 1000460) by Lion Oil Company. (cnn)
October 21, 2013 Filing 12 MOTION for Vernon C. Thompson, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ( Application fee received $ 100, receipt number 1000461) by Lion Oil Company. (cnn)
October 21, 2013 Filing 11 MOTION for Geoffrey J. Greeves to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ( Application fee received $ 100, receipt number 1000463) by Lion Oil Company. (cnn)
October 21, 2013 Filing 10 MOTION for Peter Gillon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ( Application fee received $ 100, receipt number 1000462) by Lion Oil Company. (cnn)
October 10, 2013 Filing 9 Summons Reissued as to Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Landmark American Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service. (cnn)
October 10, 2013 Filing 8 Summons Reissued as to Arch Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service. (cnn)
October 10, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly D. Logue on behalf of Lion Oil Company. (Logue, Kimberly)
October 8, 2013 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lion Oil Company identifying Corporate Parent Delek US Holdings for Lion Oil Company.. (cnn)
October 8, 2013 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Landmark American Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. (Summonses issued c/o agents of service) (cnn)
October 8, 2013 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. (Summonses issued c/o defendants counsel) (cnn)
October 8, 2013 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished (cnn)
October 8, 2013 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Lion Oil Company. (cnn)
October 8, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ace American Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183, Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC, Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Landmark American Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Torus Speciality Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 1000458), filed by Lion Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(cnn)
October 8, 2013 CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiff Lion Oil Company. Complaint,,, #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Kimberly D. Logue, Peter M. Gillon, Geoffrey J. Greeves, Vernon C. Thompson, Jr. and Vincent E. Morgan. TEXT ONLY ENTRY, NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lion Oil Company v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Navigators Syndicate at Lloyds 1221 and Pembroke Syndicate at Lloyds 4000
Represented By: Amy Churan
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Represented By: Charles M. Cannizzaro
Represented By: Martin A. Kasten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Amy Churan
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Represented By: Charles M. Cannizzaro
Represented By: Martin A. Kasten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Amy Churan
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Represented By: Charles M. Cannizzaro
Represented By: Martin A. Kasten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: Amy Churan
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Represented By: Charles M. Cannizzaro
Represented By: Martin A. Kasten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) PLC
Represented By: Amy Churan
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Represented By: Charles M. Cannizzaro
Represented By: Martin A. Kasten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL Insurance America, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Churan
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Represented By: Charles M. Cannizzaro
Represented By: Martin A. Kasten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Amy Churan
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Represented By: Charles M. Cannizzaro
Represented By: Martin A. Kasten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Hathaway International Insurance Limited
Represented By: Amy Churan
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Represented By: Charles M. Cannizzaro
Represented By: Martin A. Kasten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Amy Churan
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Represented By: Charles M. Cannizzaro
Represented By: Martin A. Kasten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Chaucer Marine Syndicate 1084
Represented By: Amy Churan
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Represented By: Charles M. Cannizzaro
Represented By: Martin A. Kasten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark American Insurance Company
Represented By: Amy Churan
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Represented By: Charles M. Cannizzaro
Represented By: Martin A. Kasten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-SJC 2003/Catlin
Represented By: Amy Churan
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Represented By: Charles M. Cannizzaro
Represented By: Martin A. Kasten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds-Talbot Syndicate 1183
Represented By: Amy Churan
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Represented By: Charles M. Cannizzaro
Represented By: Martin A. Kasten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torus Speciality Insurance Company
Represented By: Amy Churan
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Represented By: Charles M. Cannizzaro
Represented By: Martin A. Kasten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds -Brit Insurance, Syndicate 2987
Represented By: Amy Churan
Represented By: William A. Webster
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Represented By: Charles M. Cannizzaro
Represented By: Martin A. Kasten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lion Oil Company
Represented By: Peter M. Gillon
Represented By: Vincent E. Morgan
Represented By: Kimberly D. Logue
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Greeves
Represented By: Vernon C. Thompson
Represented By: Julie DeWoody Greathouse
Represented By: Brian H. Ratcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?