Johnson v. Patterson et al

Plaintiff: Willie Mae Johnson
Defendant: Tommy Patterson and Maxine Canterberry
Case Number: 1:2014cv01044
Filed: August 13, 2014
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: El Dorado Office
County: Union
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Susan O. Hickey
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT granting 38 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 41 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting 43 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 30, 2016. (mll)
July 15, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending Plaintiff's time to Respond to Defendants' interrogatories and requests for production until July 29, 2016. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 15, 2016. (mll)
July 5, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's responses to Defendant's interrogatories and requests for production of documents are due on or before July 15, 2016. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 5, 2016. (mll)
December 10, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Byron Cole Rhodes withdrawn. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the entry of this order to notify the Court of new counsel or the Court will assume Plaintiff is proceeding pro se. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 10, 2015. (mll)
September 12, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Maxine Canterberry, Tommy Patterson. Defendant is to answer within 21 days from the date of service; granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Motions terminated: 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Willie Mae Johnson. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 12, 2014. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service) (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Patterson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Mae Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxine Canterberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?