Green Source Holdings, LLC v. Ingevity Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Green Source Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Ingevity Corporation, Ingevity South Carolina, LLC and Ingevity Arkansas, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01067
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingevity Arkansas, LLC, Ingevity Corporation, Ingevity South Carolina, LLC. (Crass, Kevin)
December 28, 2018 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT filed by Ingevity Arkansas, LLC, Ingevity Corporation, Ingevity South Carolina, LLC re #21 MOTION to Dismiss UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(3) AND 12(B)(6) of Andrew Fox. (Crass, Kevin)
December 28, 2018 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #21 MOTION to Dismiss UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(3) AND 12(B)(6) by Ingevity Arkansas, LLC, Ingevity Corporation, Ingevity South Carolina, LLC. (Crass, Kevin)
December 28, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(3) AND 12(B)(6) by Ingevity Arkansas, LLC, Ingevity Corporation, Ingevity South Carolina, LLC. (Crass, Kevin)
December 27, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney Michael W. Carwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1841253) by Ingevity Arkansas, LLC, Ingevity Corporation, Ingevity South Carolina, LLC. (Crass, Kevin)
December 27, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney Marc Vander Tuig to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1841243) by Ingevity Arkansas, LLC, Ingevity Corporation, Ingevity South Carolina, LLC. (Crass, Kevin)
December 11, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Green Source Holdings, LLC. Ingevity South Carolina, LLC served on 11/7/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Laney, Brad)
December 11, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Green Source Holdings, LLC. Ingevity Corporation served on 11/7/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Laney, Brad)
December 11, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Green Source Holdings, LLC. Ingevity Arkansas, LLC served on 11/7/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Laney, Brad)
December 11, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brad Laney on behalf of Green Source Holdings, LLC. (Laney, Brad)
November 28, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas B. Clifford, Jr on behalf of Ingevity Arkansas, LLC, Ingevity Corporation, Ingevity South Carolina, LLC. (Clifford, Nicholas)
November 28, 2018 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Nicholas B. Clifford, Jr. is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter if he has not already done so. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 28, 2018. (res)
November 28, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney Nicholas B. Clifford, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number ED1000829) by Ingevity Arkansas, LLC, Ingevity Corporation, Ingevity South Carolina, LLC. (cnn)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until 12/28/18. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on November 27, 2018. (cnn)
November 26, 2018 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendants Ingevity Arkansas, LLC, Ingevity Corporation, Ingevity South Carolina, LLC. Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer #11 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Nicholas B. Clifford, Jr. (cnn)
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Ingevity Arkansas, LLC, Ingevity Corporation, Ingevity South Carolina, LLC. (Crass, Kevin)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian H. Ratcliff on behalf of Green Source Holdings, LLC. (Ratcliff, Brian)
November 1, 2018 Filing 9 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Ingevity Arkansas, LLC, Ingevity Corporation, Ingevity South Carolina, LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn)
November 1, 2018 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Ingevity South Carolina, LLC for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Shepherd, Molly)
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Ingevity Arkansas, LLC for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Shepherd, Molly)
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Ingevity Corporation for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Shepherd, Molly)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 INITIAL REPORT ON THE FILING OF A PATENT ACTION for a case initiated by Green Source Holdings, LLC with the filing of #1 Complaint. (Shepherd, Molly)
October 31, 2018 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Bradford T. Laney is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on October 31, 2018. (res)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney Bradford T. Laney to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1810103) by Green Source Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shepherd, Molly)
October 31, 2018 Complaint fee received: $ 400, receipt number 1000824. (cnn)
October 30, 2018 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE to attorney(s) filing a complaint or amended complaint in a Patent action: Please complete AO Form 120 found on the Court's website (www.arwd.uscourts.gov -> ONLINE FORMS) and file it with the Court using Other Filings-Other Documents-Initial Report.Copyright/Patent/Trademark Report due 11/20/2018. (cnn)
October 30, 2018 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiff Green Source Holdings, LLC. Complaint #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Bradford T. Laney. (cnn)
October 30, 2018 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 11/1/2018 (cnn)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Green Source Holdings, LLC. (cnn)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ingevity Arkansas, LLC, Ingevity Corporation, Ingevity South Carolina, LLC, filed by Green Source Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K)(cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Source Holdings, LLC v. Ingevity Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingevity Corporation
Represented By: Kevin A. Crass
Represented By: Nicholas B. Clifford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingevity South Carolina, LLC
Represented By: Kevin A. Crass
Represented By: Nicholas B. Clifford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingevity Arkansas, LLC
Represented By: Kevin A. Crass
Represented By: Nicholas B. Clifford, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Source Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Molly Shepherd
Represented By: Brian H. Ratcliff
Represented By: Brad Laney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?