North American Specialty Insurance Company v. Southern State Construction et al
Plaintiff: North American Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Southern State Construction, David Temple and Kendy Temple
Case Number: 1:2019cv01034
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Regan S Sherwood on behalf of North American Specialty Insurance Company. (Sherwood, Regan)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Regan S. Sherwood is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 19, 2019. (fcs)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Regan S. Sherwood to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1965208) by North American Specialty Insurance Company. (Fehse, Robert)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by North American Specialty Insurance Company. (Fehse, Robert)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Fehse, Jr on behalf of North American Specialty Insurance Company. (Fehse, Robert)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Southern State Construction, David Temple, Kendy Temple and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. (cnn)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
August 15, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiff North American Specialty Insurance Company. Complaint, #2 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Robert Fehse and Regan Sherwood. (cnn)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT FOR INDEMNIFICATION against Southern State Construction, David Temple, Kendy Temple ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 1000848), filed by North American Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(cnn)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by North American Specialty Insurance Company. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North American Specialty Insurance Company v. Southern State Construction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern State Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendy Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North American Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph T. Getz
Represented By: Regan S Sherwood
Represented By: Joseph T Getz
Represented By: Robert Fehse, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?