The Shine Shop, Inc. v. United Parcel Service Oasis Supply Corporation
Plaintiff: The Shine Shop, Inc.
Defendant: United Parcel Service Oasis Supply Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv01004
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be conducted on or before 4/22/2020. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 4/29/2020. Jury Trial set for the week of 3/29/2021 in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 25, 2020. (rwg)
March 19, 2020 Filing 10 Plaintiff's ANSWER/REPLY to #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim , Plaintiff's ANSWER/REPLY to #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by The Shine Shop, Inc..(Pratt, James)
March 12, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ryan R. Corkery is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 12, 2020. (fcs)
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney Ryan R. Corkery to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2100489) by United Parcel Service Oasis Supply Corporation. (Baker, James)
February 28, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against The Shine Shop, Inc. by United Parcel Service Oasis Supply Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX1 The Agreement)(Baker, James)
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against The Shine Shop, Inc. by United Parcel Service Oasis Supply Corporation.(Baker, James)
February 27, 2020 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #3 Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2089002.. (Baker, James)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Parcel Service Oasis Supply Corporation. (Baker, James)
February 21, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (lw)
February 21, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 2/24/2020 (lw)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against United Parcel Service Oasis Supply Corporation, filed by The Shine Shop, Inc. Filed in the Circuit Court of Ouachita County, Arkansas 52CV-20-16, 1/23/2020. (lw)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by United Parcel Service Oasis Supply Corporation. (lw)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Ouachita County, Arkansas, case number 52CV-20-16, filed by United Parcel Service Oasis Supply Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Shine Shop, Inc. v. United Parcel Service Oasis Supply Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service Oasis Supply Corporation
Represented By: James C. Baker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Shine Shop, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Pratt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?