Delek Logistics Operating LLC v. Covington Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Delek Logistics Operating LLC
Defendant: Covington Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01006
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Unopposed Motion to Remand. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 4, 2020. (cnn)
April 30, 2020 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to Remand by Delek Logistics Operating and by Covington Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Byrne, Joe)
April 27, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #22 MOTION to Stay AND COVINGTONS MOTION TO CONDUCT LIMITED JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY, AND THEREAFTER, TO AMEND COVINGTONS NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO CORRECT ANY JURISDICTIONAL DEFICIENCIES filed by Delek Logistics Operating LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Affidavit of Odely Sakazi)(Perkins, G.)
April 13, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Stay AND COVINGTONS MOTION TO CONDUCT LIMITED JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY, AND THEREAFTER, TO AMEND COVINGTONS NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO CORRECT ANY JURISDICTIONAL DEFICIENCIES by Covington Co., Inc.. (Dunlap, John)
April 10, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #20 Response to Motion by Covington Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of John K. Dunlap, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Jurisdictional Discovery)(Byrne, Joe) Modified on 4/13/2020 parties advised to file a separate motion & brief in accordance with Local Rules(cnn).
April 10, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand filed by Covington Co., Inc.. (Byrne, Joe) Modified on 4/13/2020 parties advised to file a separate motion in accordance with Local Rules (cnn).
April 8, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Sushant Mohan on behalf of Delek Logistics Operating LLC. (Mohan, Sushant)
April 7, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by John Dunlap on behalf of Covington Co., Inc.. (Dunlap, John)
April 7, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Joe Byrne on behalf of Covington Co., Inc.. (Byrne, Joe)
March 31, 2020 Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Sushant Mohan is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 31, 2020. (fcs)
March 31, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney Sushant Mohan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2112617) by Delek Logistics Operating LLC. (Perkins, G.)
March 31, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiff Delek Logistics Operating LLC. Motion to Remand #13 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Sushant Mohan. (cnn)
March 30, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #13 MOTION to Remand by Delek Logistics Operating LLC. (Perkins, G.)
March 30, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand by Delek Logistics Operating LLC. (Perkins, G.)
March 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Shepherd on behalf of Covington Co., Inc.. (Shepherd, Matthew)
March 11, 2020 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Joseph E. Byrne is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 11, 2020. (fcs)
March 11, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. John K. Dunlap is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 11, 2020. (fcs)
March 10, 2020 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Covington Co., Inc.. (Shepherd, Matthew)
March 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney Joseph E. Byrne to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2098422) by Covington Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shepherd, Matthew)
March 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney John K. Dunlap to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2098417) by Covington Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shepherd, Matthew)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Stay deadlines pending ruling on forthcoming motion to remand. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 10, 2020. (cnn)
March 5, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiff Delek Logistics Operating LLC. Motion to Stay #5 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Sushant Mohan. (mll)
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Delek Logistics Operating LLC. (Perkins, G.)
March 4, 2020 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal, Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2092992.. (Shepherd, Matthew)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lw)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Covington Co., Inc., filed by Delek Logistics Operating LLC. Filed in the Circuit Court of Union County, Arkansas, 1/24/20, 70CV-20-36.(lw)
March 2, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (lw)
March 2, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant Covington Co., Inc. Notice of Removal #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorneys, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Joseph E. Byrne and John K. Dunlap. (lw)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Covington Co., Inc. (lw)
March 2, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 3/4/2020. (lw)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Union County, Arkansas, case number 70CV-20-36, filed by Covington Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delek Logistics Operating LLC v. Covington Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delek Logistics Operating LLC
Represented By: William Ray Whitman
Represented By: G. Alan Perkins
Represented By: Monica Kristin Gerety
Represented By: Sushant Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covington Co., Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Shepherd
Represented By: John Dunlap
Represented By: Joe Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?