United States of America v. BES Design/Build, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: BES Design/Build, LLC and Aegis Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01008
Filed: March 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3133
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Civil case administratively terminated. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 27, 2020. (mll)
April 24, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF Motion re #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Shepherd, John)
April 13, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Aegis Security Insurance Company.(Dry, Ryan)
April 13, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by United States of America. BES Design/Build, LLC served on 3/23/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Shepherd, John)
April 13, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by United States of America. Aegis Security Insurance Company served on 3/23/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Shepherd, John)
April 13, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay by BES Design/Build, LLC. (Deitchler, Max)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay by BES Design/Build, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Deitchler, Max)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle T. Unser on behalf of BES Design/Build, LLC. (Unser, Kyle)
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Max R. Deitchler on behalf of BES Design/Build, LLC. (Deitchler, Max)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Aegis Security Insurance Company, BES Design/Build, LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn)
March 18, 2020 Complaint filing fee paid re #2 Complaint : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2104677.. (Shepherd, John)
March 18, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 3/20/2020 (cnn)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to BES Design/Build, LLC for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Shepherd, John)
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Aegis Security Insurance Company for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Shepherd, John)
March 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Shepherd, John)
March 17, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by United States of America. Please proceed with filing your case initiating documents.If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. BES Design/Build, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BES Design/Build, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Dry
Represented By: Max R. Deitchler
Represented By: Kyle T. Unser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aegis Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Ryan Dry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: John Thomas Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?