Campbell v. Clyde et al
Plaintiff: Boyd Brinlee Campbell
Defendant: Andrew Clyde and Roger Jenkins
Case Number: 1:2020cv01010
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 15 Docket Annotation of Mailing: A copy of the Initial Scheduling Order was mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff, Boyd Brinlee Campbell on 5/21/20. (slc)
May 21, 2020 Filing 14 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 8/17/2020 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/9/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 21, 2020. (slc)
May 19, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Andrew Clyde, Roger Jenkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Roger Jenkins)(Shepherd, Matthew)
May 19, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Andrew Clyde, Roger Jenkins. (Shepherd, Matthew)
May 6, 2020 Filing 11 USM285 FORM/ SUMMONS Returned Executed by Boyd Brinlee Campbell. Andrew Clyde and Roger Jenkins served on 4/30/2020, answer due 5/21/2020. (cnn)
April 23, 2020 Filing 10 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Andrew Clyde, Roger Jenkins and USM285 forms delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #1 Complaint, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #9 Order Directing Service. (mll)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Reconsideration re #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion for Service; ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Andrew Clyde, Roger Jenkins and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 23, 2020. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service)(mll)
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #7 MOTION for Reconsideration re #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, Order on Motion for Service, filed by Boyd Brinlee Campbell to Honorable Barry A. Bryant. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 23, 2020. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(ee)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Reconsideration re #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion for Service by Boyd Brinlee Campbell. (mll)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #2 Motion for Service. Plaintiff is directed to pay the filing fee within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order or this case is subject to dismissal. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 14, 2020 (mll)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Honorable Susan O. Hickey no longer assigned (recusal) to the case. (cnn)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Barry A. Bryant: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service filed by Boyd Brinlee Campbell. Motions referred to Honorable Barry A. Bryant.(cnn)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Boyd Brinlee Campbell. (cnn)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Boyd Brinlee Campbell.(cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Clyde et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Clyde
Represented By: Matthew J. Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Jenkins
Represented By: Matthew J. Shepherd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boyd Brinlee Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?