Holly v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Sonda Holly
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 1:2020cv01015
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonda Holly. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 5/22/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wallace, Stephanie)
May 15, 2020 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn)
May 14, 2020 Complaint filing fee paid re #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion for Service, Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2141741.. (Wallace, Stephanie)
April 28, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. #6 Order denying Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 if proper fees are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal. Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 5/15/2020 (cnn)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ( Filing Fee due by 5/15/2020). Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on April 24, 2020. (cnn)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Sonda Holly. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Wallace, Stephanie)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 5/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form)(cnn)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Sonda Holly. (cnn)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Sonda Holly.(cnn)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Sonda Holly. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holly v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonda Holly
Represented By: Stephanie Bartels Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?