Fuller et al v. Atlantic Exploration
Plaintiff: Thurman Fuller, Louise Sawyer, Grace Fuller, George Fuller, Elizabeth Donell, Clara Fuller and Patricia Dockery
Defendant: Atlantic Exploration
Case Number: 1:2020cv01019
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE by Clara Fuller re #12 Order directing plaintiff to provide information. (cnn)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #2 , #3 , #4 , #5 , #6 , #7 , #8 Motion(s) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; plaintiffs directed to provide court with an address for service within 20 days. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 11, 2020. (cnn)
May 7, 2020 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER REFERRING CASE to Honorable Barry A. Bryant, U.S. Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and Local Rule 72.1 for full pretrial/dispositive motions. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on May 7, 2020. (rwg)
May 6, 2020 Filing 10 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Barry A. Bryant: #2 , #3 , #4 , #5 , #6 , #7 and #8 MOTION(s) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by plaintiffs. Motions referred to Honorable Barry A. Bryant.(cnn) Modified docket text on 5/6/2020 (mfr).
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Louise Sawyer. (cnn)
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Patricia Dockery. (cnn)
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Elizabeth Donell. (cnn)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thurman Fuller. (cnn)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by George Fuller. (cnn)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Grace Fuller. (cnn)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Clara Fuller. (cnn)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Atlantic Exploration, filed by Elizabeth Donell, Thurman Fuller, George Fuller, Grace Fuller, Patricia Dockery, Clara Fuller, Louise Sawyer.(cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuller et al v. Atlantic Exploration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thurman Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Donell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Dockery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Exploration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?