Barrette et al v. Foremost Insurance Group et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Barrette, John T. Barrette, Elizabeth Barrett and John T. Barrett
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Group, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida and Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Case Number: 1:2020cv01025
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Filing 17 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan, American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, Elizabeth Barrett, John T. Barrett. (Breeding, Mark) Modified to add joint filers on 7/8/2020. (mll)
July 1, 2020 Filing 16 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan. (Breeding, Mark)
July 1, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan.(Breeding, Mark)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying as moot #5 Motion to Dismiss Case. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 23, 2020. (cnn)
June 18, 2020 Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be conducted by 7/16/2020. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 7/23/2020. Jury Trial set for 7/12/2021 in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on June 18, 2020. (rwg)
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Foremost Insurance Group and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn)
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan for service of the following document: #10 Amended Complaint. (Thomas, III, Floyd)
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #3 Complaint against Foremost Insurance Group , filed by Elizabeth Barrette, John T. Barrette. Related document: #3 Complaint filed by John T. Barrette, Elizabeth Barrette.(Thomas, III, Floyd)
June 12, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Elizabeth Barrette, John T. Barrette. (Thomas, III, Floyd)
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida re #1 Notice of Removal Consent to Removal. (Heister, Michael)
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Heister, Michael)
June 4, 2020 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2154807.. (Breeding, Mark)
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Foremost Insurance Group. (Breeding, Mark) Modified on 6/5/2020 to create document link (cnn).
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Foremost Insurance Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy)(Breeding, Mark)
June 4, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 6/8/2020. (mll)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida, Foremost Insurance Group filed by Elizabeth Barrette, John T. Barrette. (Originally filed in state court.)(mll)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Foremost Insurance Group. (mll)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Union County Circuit Court, case number 70CV-135-6. filed by Foremost Insurance Group. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - State Court Complaint, #2 Ex. B - State Court Summons)(mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrette et al v. Foremost Insurance Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Barrette
Represented By: Floyd Mattison Thomas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T. Barrette
Represented By: Floyd Mattison Thomas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Barrett
Represented By: Floyd Mattison Thomas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T. Barrett
Represented By: Floyd Mattison Thomas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Group
Represented By: Mark Stephen Breeding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida
Represented By: Michael B. Heister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Represented By: Mark Stephen Breeding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?