Stewart v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Travis Stewart
Defendant: Delek US Holdings, Inc. and UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv01052
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Donovan, David)
November 3, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Delek Holdings US, Inc. by Travis Stewart. (Lacy, Brandon)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Travis Stewart. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America served on 10/27/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Lacy, Brandon)
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Donovan on behalf of UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Donovan, David)
October 22, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Delek US Holdings, Inc., UNUM Life Insurance Company of America and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn)
October 22, 2020 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Delek Holdings US, Inc. and Unum Life Insurance Company of America for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Lacy, Brandon)
October 22, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Delek US Holdings, Inc., UNUM Life Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2254984), filed by Travis Stewart.(Lacy, Brandon)
October 20, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Travis Stewart. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Stewart
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delek US Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?