El Dorado School District v. K.J., by and through his Parent, K.J.W.
Plaintiff: El Dorado School District
Defendant: K.J.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01031
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1401
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER/REPLY to #13 Counterclaim by El Dorado School District.(Eddings, Khayyam) Modified on 8/17/2021 to clarify text (cnn).
August 12, 2021 Filing 24 THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT.SEALED DOCUMENT by El Dorado School District. An Order was entered on 7/15/2021 allowing the document(s) to be filed under seal. This docket entry is related to #2 Complaint. (Eddings, Khayyam)
August 12, 2021 Filing 23 THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT.SEALED DOCUMENT by El Dorado School District. An Order was entered on 7/15/2021 allowing the document(s) to be filed under seal. This docket entry is related to #2 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H-21-08, H-21-24 Due Process Hearing Transcript Vol. I, #2 Exhibit H-21-08, H-21-24 Due Process Hearing Transcript Vol. II, #3 Exhibit H-21-08, H-21-24 Due Process Hearing Transcript Vol. III) (Eddings, Khayyam)
August 11, 2021 Filing 22 SUR-REPLY by El Dorado School District re #21 Reply to Response to Motion, #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #19 Reply to Response to Motion, SUR-REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Heller, Christopher)
August 10, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY in Support of 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by K.J.(by and through his Parent, K.J.W.). (Caldwell, Theresa) Modified document title on 8/11/2021. (mll)
August 9, 2021 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Susan O. Hickey: Motion Hearing held on 8/9/2021 re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by El Dorado School District, and 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by K.J.. (Felisha Burson-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in El Dorado-2nd Flr) (rwg)
August 8, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , and Response in opposition to 17 CROSS MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by El Dorado School District. (Eddings, Khayyam) Modified on 8/9/2021 for clarification (cnn).
August 6, 2021 Filing 18 THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT.SEALED DOCUMENT by K.J.(by and through his Parent, K.J.W.). An Order was entered on 7/30/2021 allowing the document(s) to be filed under seal. This docket entry is related to #11 Order on Motion for Leave, #2 Complaint, #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Supplement PLEADINGS, #2 Supplement PREHEARING1 TRANSCRIPT, #3 Supplement TRANSCRIPT - VOL 1, #4 Supplement PREHEARING2 TRANSCRIPT, #5 Supplement TRANSCRIPT VOL 2, #6 Supplement TRANSCRIPT VOL 3, #7 Supplement TRANSCRIPT VOL 4, #8 Supplement TRANSCRIPT VOL 5, #9 Supplement TRANSCRIPT VOL 6, #10 Supplement TRANSCRIPT VOL 7, #11 Supplement TRANSCRIPT VOL 8, #12 Supplement TRANSCRIPT VOL 9, #13 Supplement TRANSCRIPT VOL 10, #14 Supplement TRANSCRIPT VOL 11, #15 Supplement TRANSCRIPT VOL 12, #16 Supplement PARENT EXHIBITS VOL 1, #17 Supplement PARENT EXHIBITS VOL 2, #18 Supplement PARENT EXHIBITS VOL 3, #19 Supplement DISTRICT EXHIBITS VOL 1, #20 Supplement DISTRICT EXHIBITS VOL 2, #21 Supplement DISTRICT EXHIBITS VOL, #22 Supplement DISTRICT EXHIBITS VOL 4) (Caldwell, Theresa)
July 30, 2021 Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ORDER Setting Hearing on #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2021 @ 09:00 AM in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 30, 2021. (rwg)
July 27, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Response to Motion #9 by K.J. (entered per chambers see document #14 ) (cnn)
July 27, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #14 Response to Motion, MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by K.J.(by and through his Parent, K.J.W.). (Caldwell, Theresa)
July 27, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by K.J.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SLD Guidelines, #2 Exhibit B - OHI Guidelines)(Caldwell, Theresa)
July 27, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM (Verified) against El Dorado School District by K.J..(Caldwell, Theresa)
July 26, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against El Dorado School District by K.J..(Caldwell, Theresa)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to file Record under Seal. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 15, 2021. (cnn) Modified on 7/16/2021 to edit text(hnc).
July 12, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by El Dorado School District. (Heller, Christopher)
July 12, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by El Dorado School District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Heller, Christopher)
July 9, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by El Dorado School District. El Dorado School District served on 7/7/2021, answer due 7/28/2021. (Heller, Christopher)
July 2, 2021 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to K.J. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (mll)
July 1, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to FILE RECORD UNDER SEAL by El Dorado School District. (Eddings, Khayyam)
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Khayyam M. Eddings on behalf of El Dorado School District. (Eddings, Khayyam)
July 1, 2021 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to K.J., by and through his Parent, K.J.W. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Heller, Christopher)
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mll)
July 1, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against K.J. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BARWDC-2419751), filed by El Dorado School District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Heller, Christopher)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by El Dorado School District. Please proceed with filing your case initiating documents.If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (mll) Modified filed date on 7/1/2021. (mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El Dorado School District v. K.J., by and through his Parent, K.J.W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.J.
Represented By: Theresa L. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: El Dorado School District
Represented By: Khayyam M. Eddings
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?