Story v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Story
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America and Share Foundation
Case Number: 1:2021cv01035
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATED RECORD SCHEDULING ORDER setting deadlines as set forth: No reply briefs will be allowed without leave of court. Stipulated Record is due by 2/9/2022. Plaintiff Brief due by 5/10/2022. Defendant Brief due by 5/23/2022. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 2, 2021. (rwg)
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Donovan, David)
August 6, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Sharon Story. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America served on 8/1/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Lacy, Brandon) Modified on 8/9/2021; defendant served on 8/2/21 not 8/1 correct answer due date is 8/24/21 (cnn).
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Stipulation filed by Sharon Story, Share Foundation dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 5, 2021. (cnn)
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Share Foundation by Sharon Story. (Lacy, Brandon)
July 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Donovan on behalf of UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Donovan, David)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Unum Life Insurance Company of America and Share Foundation for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Lacy, Brandon)
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Share Foundation, UNUM Life Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2432352), filed by Sharon Story.(Lacy, Brandon)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Sharon Story. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Story v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Story
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Share Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?