Charles v. Union County, Arkansas et al
Plaintiff: Steven Charles
Defendant: Union County, Arkansas and Jeff Orr
Case Number: 1:2022cv01002
Filed: January 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Barry A Bryant
Referring Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 Filing 9 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Union County, Arkansas. (Neemann, Camille)
February 7, 2022 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/28/2022 09:00 AM in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Barry A Bryant.. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on February 7, 2022. (sss)
January 24, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Honorable Barry A Bryant. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on January 24, 2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Plaintiff's consent, #2 Affidavit Defendants Consent)(sss)
January 18, 2022 TEXT ONLY NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY directed to Steven Charles: A #6 Notice of Availability of a US Magistrate Judge was filed with the Court and contains one or more deficiencies. Per instructions at bottom of Notice, form is not to be filed but mailed with original signature.(mll)
January 11, 2022 Filing 6 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. NOTICE FILED IN ERROR.*** NOTICE by Steven Charles Notice of availability of a US Magistrate Judge (Sutter, Luther) Modified on 1/18/2022.(mll)
January 7, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jeff Orr, Union County, Arkansas.(Neemann, Camille)
January 7, 2022 Filing 4 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jeff Orr, Union County, Arkansas, filed by Steven Charles. (originally filed in state court)(cnn)
January 7, 2022 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
January 7, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Union County Circuit Court, case number CV 21-407., filed by Jeff Orr, Union County, Arkansas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(cnn)
January 7, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Jeff Orr, Union County, Arkansas. (cnn)
January 7, 2022 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #2 Notice of Removal : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2521467.. (Neemann, Camille)
January 7, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 1/10/2022 (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles v. Union County, Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Charles
Represented By: Lucien Gillham
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union County, Arkansas
Represented By: Camille Marie Neemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Orr
Represented By: Camille Marie Neemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?