Orange State Realty, Inc. v. Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Orange State Realty, Inc.
Defendant: Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01031
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Reed on behalf of Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. (Reed, Austin)
June 17, 2022 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.; Answer to Complaint #8 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Austin C. Reed. (hnc)
June 16, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #3 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Petition for Temporary Restraining Order by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc..(Baker, John)
June 7, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Orange State Realty, Inc.. (Thomas, III, Floyd)
June 2, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.. (Baker, John)
June 2, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
June 2, 2022 Filing 4 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (originally filed in state court) (cnn)
June 2, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc., filed by Orange State Realty, Inc. (originally filed in state court)(cnn)
June 2, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Union County Circuit Court, case number CV 22-223-4., filed by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(cnn) (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/3/2022) (hnc). (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/3/2022) (hnc). (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/3/2022) (hnc). (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/3/2022) (hnc). (Attachment 4 replaced on 6/3/2022) (hnc).
June 2, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. (cnn)
June 2, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal. Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 6/6/2022 (cnn)
June 2, 2022 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #2 Notice of Removal : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2602234.. (Baker, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orange State Realty, Inc. v. Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orange State Realty, Inc.
Represented By: Floyd Mattison Thomas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.
Represented By: John Keeling Baker
Represented By: Austin Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?