Pioneer Civil Construction, LLC v. Ingevity Arkansas, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pioneer Civil Construction, LLC
Defendant: Ingevity Arkansas, LLC and Ingevity Corporation
Case Number: 1:2022cv01034
Filed: June 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying as moot #6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 11, 2022. (cnn)
August 9, 2022 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #27 Response to Motion, PLANTIFF'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT by Pioneer Civil Construction, LLC. (Henry, Judy)
August 9, 2022 Filing 27 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Verified Complaint PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT filed by Pioneer Civil Construction, LLC. (Henry, Judy)
August 9, 2022 Filing 26 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be conducted on or before 9/7/2022. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 9/14/2022. Jury Trial set for 8/7/2023 in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 9, 2022. (rwg)
August 9, 2022 Filing 25 **DISREGARD - WRONG PDF ATTACHED** INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be conducted on or before 9/7/2022. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 9/14/2022. Jury Trial set for 8/7/2023 in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 9, 2022. (rwg) Modified on 8/9/2022 (rwg).
August 4, 2022 Filing 24 REPLY by Pioneer Civil Construction, LLC re #21 Response to Motion, PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF REGARDING MOTION TO ENFORCE THE CIRCUIT COURT'S PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2)(Henry, Judy)
August 3, 2022 Filing 23 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 3, 2022. (cha)
August 2, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF REGARDING MOTION TO ENFORCE THE CIRCUIT COURT'S PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER by Pioneer Civil Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Henry, Judy)
July 26, 2022 Filing 21 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #16 MOTION to enforce the circuit court's preliminary injunction order and incorporated brief filed by Ingevity Arkansas, LLC, Ingevity Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit B - Email Chain to Judy Henry, #3 Exhibit C - 2022.05.18 Email to J. Henry re Removal to Federal Court, #4 Exhibit D - 2022.05.19 Hearing Transcript)(Carson, Dorsey)
July 26, 2022 Filing 20 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #15 MOTION Entry of order that allegations not addressed or denied in partial motion to dismiss are admitted or alternatively motion for default judgment on the relief sought in those allegations and incorporated brief filed by Ingevity Arkansas, LLC, Ingevity Corporation. (Carson, Dorsey)
July 26, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Pioneer Civil Construction, LLC by Ingevity Arkansas, LLC, Ingevity Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 5-19-22 Hearing Transcript)(Carson, Dorsey)
July 26, 2022 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Verified Complaint by Ingevity Arkansas, LLC, Ingevity Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Granting Motion Prelim Injunction (state court))(Carson, Dorsey)
July 26, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Verified Complaint by Ingevity Arkansas, LLC, Ingevity Corporation. (Carson, Dorsey)
July 12, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to enforce the circuit court's preliminary injunction order and incorporated brief by Pioneer Civil Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Henry, Judy)
July 12, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION Entry of order that allegations not addressed or denied in partial motion to dismiss are admitted or alternatively motion for default judgment on the relief sought in those allegations and incorporated brief by Pioneer Civil Construction, LLC. (Henry, Judy)
July 12, 2022 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #3 Complaint against Ingevity Arkansas, LLC, Ingevity Corporation Verified First Amended Complaint, filed by Pioneer Civil Construction, LLC. Related document: #3 Complaint filed by Pioneer Civil Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Henry, Judy)
July 5, 2022 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #12 Response to Motion, Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Response to Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss by Pioneer Civil Construction, LLC. (Henry, Judy)
July 5, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Partially Count I of the Plaintiff's Verified Complaint, and to Dismiss Counts II, III, and IV Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Pioneer Civil Construction, LLC. (Henry, Judy)
June 28, 2022 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Pioneer Civil Construction, LLC. (Henry, Judy)
June 27, 2022 Filing 10 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR.*** NOTICE by Pioneer Civil Construction, LLC Notice of Request for Jury Trial (Henry, Judy) Modified on 6/28/2022.(mll)
June 24, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingevity Arkansas, LLC, Ingevity Corporation. (Carson, Dorsey)
June 21, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingevity Arkansas, LLC, Ingevity Corporation. (Carson, Dorsey)
June 21, 2022 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss Partially Count I of the Plaintiff's Verified Complaint, and to Dismiss Counts II, III, and IV by Ingevity Arkansas, LLC, Ingevity Corporation. (Carson, Dorsey)
June 21, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Partially Count I of the Plaintiff's Verified Complaint, and to Dismiss Counts II, III, and IV by Ingevity Arkansas, LLC, Ingevity Corporation. (Carson, Dorsey)
June 14, 2022 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #2 Notice of Removal : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2607585.. (Carson, Dorsey)
June 13, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
June 13, 2022 Filing 4 STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION WITH NOTICE (originally filed in state court) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript)(cnn) Modified text on 6/15/2022 (lgd).
June 13, 2022 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Ingevity Arkansas, LLC, Ingevity Corporation, filed by Pioneer Civil Construction, LLC. (originally filed in state court)(cnn) Modified text on 6/15/2022 (lgd).
June 13, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ashley County Circuit, case number CV2022-94-3., filed by Ingevity Arkansas, LLC, Ingevity Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(cnn)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ingevity Arkansas, LLC, Ingevity Corporation. (cnn)
June 13, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal. Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 6/15/2022 (cnn)
June 13, 2022 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (cnn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pioneer Civil Construction, LLC v. Ingevity Arkansas, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pioneer Civil Construction, LLC
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Represented By: Patrick Collins Hickman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingevity Arkansas, LLC
Represented By: Dorsey R Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingevity Corporation
Represented By: Dorsey R Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?