United Financial Casualty Company v. Avant Trucking, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United Financial Casualty Company
Defendant: Avant Trucking, LLC, Blann Tractor Company, Inc., Cherokee Insurance Company and Richard Harold McDougal
Case Number: 1:2022cv01065
Filed: November 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Guy Alton Wade on behalf of Cherokee Insurance Company. (Wade, Guy)
December 19, 2022 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cherokee Insurance Company. (Brick, Phillip)
December 12, 2022 TEXT ONLY NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY directed to Cherokee Insurance Company: A #15 Notice of Appearance was filed with the Court and appears to be deficient as follows: The Notice of Appearance states GUY ALTON WADE is appearing on behalf of Defendant Cherokee Insurance Company. However, the Notice was filed using PHLLIP BRICK's login. Please refile. You are advised that the filing, while on the record, will not be considered unless and until all deficiencies are remedied. (mll)
December 9, 2022 Filing 15 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR.*** NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip M. Brick, Jr on behalf of Cherokee Insurance Company. (Brick, Phillip) Modified on 12/12/2022.(mll)
December 1, 2022 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Avant Trucking, LLC. (Runyon, Emily)
December 1, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Avant Trucking, LLC.(Runyon, Emily)
December 1, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Connie L Grace on behalf of Richard Harold McDougal. (Grace, Connie)
November 30, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Richard Harold McDougal.(Minton, M.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2022: #1 Exhibit A) (cnn).
November 30, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Justin Minton on behalf of Richard Harold McDougal. (Minton, M.)
November 29, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blann Tractor Company, Inc.. (Thompson, Michael)
November 29, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Blann Tractor Company, Inc..(Thompson, Michael)
November 29, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Complaint ANSWER OF SEPARATE DEFENDANT CHEROKEE INSURANCE COMPANY by Cherokee Insurance Company.(Brick, Phillip)
November 1, 2022 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Avant Trucking, LLC, Blann Tractor Company, Inc., Cherokee Insurance Company, Richard Harold McDougal (individually), Richard McDougal (Special Admins.) and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn)
November 1, 2022 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Avant Trucking, LLC, Blann Tractor Company, Inc., Cherokee Insurance Company, Richard Harold McDougal, Richard Harold McDougal as Special Administrator Estate of Randall McDougal for service of the following document: #3 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement)(Denton, Deborah)
November 1, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Financial Casualty Company. (Denton, Deborah)
November 1, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT for declaratory judgment against All Defendants, filed by United Financial Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Denton, Deborah)
November 1, 2022 Filing 2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn)
November 1, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by United Financial Casualty Company. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (cnn)
November 1, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Civil Cover Sheet,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 11/3/2022 (cnn)
November 1, 2022 Complaint filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2681962.. (Denton, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Financial Casualty Company v. Avant Trucking, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Financial Casualty Company
Represented By: Deborah S. Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avant Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Emily M. Runyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blann Tractor Company, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherokee Insurance Company
Represented By: Guy Alton Wade
Represented By: Phillip M. Brick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Harold McDougal
Represented By: Connie L Grace
Represented By: M. Justin Minton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?