Lockheed Martin Corporation Salaried Savings Plan v. Hicks-Haynie
Defendant: Elizabeth Danielle Hicks-Hayne, Elizabeth Danielle Hicks-Haynie, Dorothy A. Henry, L.H., a minor, J.H., a minor and Jamal Latrell Haynie
Counter Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation Salaried Savings Plan
Case Number: 1:2023cv01105
Filed: November 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Susan O Hickey
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2024 Filing 19 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Lockheed Martin Corporation Salaried Savings Plan. (Buhite, Russell)
December 21, 2023 Filing 18 ANSWER/REPLY to #10 Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint),, Counterclaim, for Interpleader Relief and Counterclaim for Interpleader Proceeds by Lockheed Martin Corporation Salaried Savings Plan.(Buhite, Russell)
December 20, 2023 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation Salaried Savings Plan. Elizabeth Danielle Hicks-Haynie served on 12/14/2023, answer due 1/4/2024. (Buhite, Russell)
December 19, 2023 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation Salaried Savings Plan. Dorothy A. Henry served on 12/13/2023, answer due 1/3/2024. (Buhite, Russell)
December 18, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Scott Buhite on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation Salaried Savings Plan. (Buhite, Russell)
December 18, 2023 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Russell S. Buhite is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his/her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 18, 2023. (cha)
December 5, 2023 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lockheed Martin Corporation Salaried Savings Plan. (Hodges, Melissa)
December 5, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney Russell S. Buhite to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2886291) by Lockheed Martin Corporation Salaried Savings Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (List of Court Admissions))(Hodges, Melissa)
December 5, 2023 Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be conducted by 1/2/2024. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 1/9/2024. Bench Trial set for 9/30/2024 in El Dorado -- 2nd flr before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 5, 2023. (rwg) (Main Document 11 replaced on 12/6/2023 to correct Joint Rule 26(f) Report Due Date.) (rwg).
November 30, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, for Interpleader Relief, COUNTERCLAIM for Interpleader Proceeds against Lockheed Martin Corporation Salaried Savings Plan by J.H., a minor, Jamal Latrell Haynie, L.H., a minor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bramblett, Eugene)
November 28, 2023 Filing 9 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Dorothy A. Henry, Elizabeth Danielle Hicks-Haynie and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED.(mll)
November 17, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation Salaried Savings Plan. Jamal Latrell Haynie was sent waiver on 11/17/2023, answer due 1/16/2024; J.H., a minor was sent waiver on 11/17/2023, answer due 1/16/2024; L.H., a minor was sent waiver on 11/17/2023, answer due 1/16/2024. (Hodges, Melissa)
November 17, 2023 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR REFUND OF FEES PAID with Pay.gov Tracking ID AARWDC-2875764 and Receipt Number 042328 by Lockheed Martin Corporation Salaried Savings Plan. (Attachments: #1 Receipt of Payment)(Hodges, Melissa)
November 16, 2023 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Jamal L. Haynie for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Hodges, Melissa)
November 16, 2023 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Jacqueline Keller and Steven Keller for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Hodges, Melissa)
November 16, 2023 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Dorothy A. Henry for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Hodges, Melissa)
November 16, 2023 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Elizabeth Hicks-Haynie for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Hodges, Melissa)
November 16, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Interpleader Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2875974), filed by Lockheed Martin Corporation Salaried Savings Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Salaried Savings Plan Docs), #2 Exhibit B (Beneficiary Designation), #3 Exhibit C (Death Notification), #4 Exhibit D (Bramblett Ltr. Conviction & Sentencing), #5 Exhibit E (Estate Claim Notice), #6 Exhibit F (Guardianship))(Hodges, Melissa)
November 15, 2023 Complaint fee received: $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2875764. (tmc)
November 15, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Lockheed Martin Corporation Salaried Savings Plan. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (tg) (tg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lockheed Martin Corporation Salaried Savings Plan v. Hicks-Haynie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation Salaried Savings Plan
Represented By: Melissa Kimberly Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Danielle Hicks-Hayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Danielle Hicks-Haynie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy A. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.H., a minor
Represented By: Eugene D. Bramblett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.H., a minor
Represented By: Eugene D. Bramblett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamal Latrell Haynie
Represented By: Eugene D. Bramblett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?