Jones v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 2:2006cv02034
Filed: March 28, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2007 18 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 Motion for Attorney's Fees under the EAJA in the amount of $1,876.80. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on April 13, 2007. (mfr)
April 5, 2007 17 RESPONSE to Motion re 15 MOTION for Attorney Fees For an Award Under Equal Access To Justice Act filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Webb, Mark)
March 26, 2007 16 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Approval of Attorneys Fees Under the Equal Access To Justice Act by Rufus Ralph Jones. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4)(Harp, David)
March 26, 2007 15 MOTION for Attorney Fees For an Award Under Equal Access To Justice Act by Rufus Ralph Jones. (Attachments: # 1)(Harp, David)
January 23, 2007 14 JUDGMENT: reversing the decision of the Commissioner and remanding this case for further consideration pursuant to sentence four of 42 USC 405(g), in favor of Plaintiff and against the Defendant Social Security Administration Commissioner. An application for attorney's fees and costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act may be filed up until 30 days after the judgment becomes "not appealable" i.e. 30 days after the 60-day time for appeal has ended. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on January 23, 2007. (sh)
January 23, 2007 13 MEMORANDUM OPINION:. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on January 23, 2007. (sh)
January 4, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT: Case reassigned to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (mfr)
July 24, 2006 12 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Webb, Mark)
June 21, 2006 11 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Rufus Ralph Jones. (Harp, David)
May 23, 2006 10 Featured Case ORDER that parties have been advised of the court's briefing schedule and in the interest of judicial economy, the court limits any appeal briefs filed by the parties to a MAXIMUM of 20 pages; further any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 5/23/2006. (rw)
May 23, 2006 9 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (jck)
May 22, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 6/21/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 7/21/2006. (mfr)
May 22, 2006 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Webb, Mark)
May 17, 2006 Reset Answer due date: Social Security Administration Commissioner answer due 6/12/2006. (rw)
April 25, 2006 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and complaint, filed by Rufus Ralph Jones. (Harp, David)
April 25, 2006 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and complaint, filed by Rufus Ralph Jones. (Harp, David)
April 25, 2006 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, filed by Rufus Ralph Jones. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 4/10/2006, answer due 6/12/2006. (Harp, David) Modified on 5/17/2006 to edit answer due date(rw).
April 24, 2006 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on April 24, 2006. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit-plaintiff's consent; #(2) Exhibit-defendant's consent)(djm)
March 28, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (rw )
March 28, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER re granting 2 Application filed by Rufus Ralph Jones, and directing that complaint be filed nunc pro tunc as of 3/27/2006; further directing that a copy of the complaint, along with a copy of Order be served by the plaintiff by certified mail, return receipt requested on the defendant Jo Anne B. Barnhart, Commissioner Social Security Administration Commissioner, as well as Alberto R. Gonzales, U.S. Attorney General and Mark W. Webb, Assistant U.S. Attorney without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor; further defendant is ordered to answer within 60 days from the date of service . Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 3/28/2006. (rw, )
March 28, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Rufus Ralph Jones. (rw )
March 28, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner (Filing fee $ 0.) , filed by Rufus Ralph Jones. (filed nunc pro tunc as of 3/27/2006) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(rw ) Modified on 3/28/2006 to add text (rw ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?