Willis v. Sebastian County Sheriff Frank Atkinson et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv02069
Filed: June 15, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2009 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 100 , and denying 106 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, re: request for copies of tapes from the evidentiary hearing held on June 15, 2009.Case association terminated, ***Civil Case Terminated. Motions terminated, and case DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Bench trial currently scheduled for October 19, 2009 is canceled. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 9, 2009. (sh)
July 2, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 44 Amended Complaint filed by Carl Edward Willis, 4 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Carl Edward Willis. Objections to R&R due by 7/20/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on July 2, 2009. (sh)
March 16, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 66 Report and Recommendations in its entirety and granting defendants' 59 Motion for Summary Judgment as to plaintiff's official capacity claims and claims of tampering with legal mail, missed medications, racial threats and failure to protect from jail personnel, and these claims are dismissed with prejudice; further defendants' motion is denied as to plaintiff's claims of excessive force, denial of medical attention after altercation with inmate Combs and guards, failure to protect plaintiff from inmate Combs, lack of due process at disciplinary hearing and retaliation and these claims will be set for a bench trial. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 16, 2009. (rw)
February 23, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Paul, Crystal - Reed, Reilly, Jacob Fink, Jackson, Anita Bass, Dutton, Conger, Moulder, Restine, Sebastian County Sheriff Frank Atkinson. Objections to R&R due by 3/12/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 23, 2009. (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. Sebastian County Sheriff Frank Atkinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?