Ferguson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 2:2006cv02154
Filed: August 30, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2007 15 JUDGMENT: affirming the ALJ's decision to deny the plaintiff's benefits, and in favor of Defendant Social Security Admin and against Plaintiff Timothy Ferguson, ***Civil Case Terminated and dismissed with prejudice. Parties have (60) days from entry of the judgment on the docket in which to appeal. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on June 25, 2007. (sh) Modified on 6/25/2007 to edit text (sh).
June 25, 2007 14 MEMORANDUM OPINION: Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on June 25, 2007. (sh)
January 4, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT: Case reassigned to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (mfr)
December 14, 2006 13 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Webb, Mark)
November 29, 2006 12 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Timothy Ferguson. (Harp, David)
October 30, 2006 11 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 10/30/2006. (cla)
October 30, 2006 10 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (cla)
October 30, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 11/29/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 12/29/2006. (mfr)
October 30, 2006 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner, Jo Anne B Barnhart.(Webb, Mark)
September 27, 2006 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Signed by Judge Robert T. Dawson on September 27, 2006. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Consent; # 2 Government's Consent)(mfr)
September 15, 2006 Reset Deadlines: Social Security Administration Commissioner answer due 11/8/2006. (rw)
September 14, 2006 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service Off of Regional Chief Counsel, filed by Timothy Ferguson. (Harp, David)
September 14, 2006 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service Atty of U.S., filed by Timothy Ferguson. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 9/8/2006, answer due 11/8/2006. (Harp, David) Modified on 9/15/2006 to edit text (rw).
September 14, 2006 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service U.S. Atty, filed by Timothy Ferguson. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 9/6/2006, answer due 11/6/2006. (Harp, David) Modified on 9/15/2006 to edit text (rw).
August 30, 2006 4 COMPLAINT filed nunc pro tunc as of 8/28/06 against Jo Anne B Barnhart , filed by Timothy Ferguson. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of appeals counsil# 2 Notice of decision# 3 Jurisdiction)(sh)
August 30, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 1 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk is directed to file the 2 complaint nunc pro tunc as of 08/28/06. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on August 30, 2006. (sh)
August 30, 2006 2 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. INCOMPLETE PDF attached. Refiled: Document 4 ***COMPLAINT against Defendant Jo Anne B Barnhart , filed by Plaintiff Timothy Ferguson. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of appeal counsel action # 2 Notice of Decision # 3 Jurisdiction and Procedural History.(sh) Modified on 8/30/2006 to edit docket text.(mfr).
August 30, 2006 1 IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION filed by Plaintiff Timothy Ferguson. (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?