Gant v. Wyeth et al

Plaintiff: Delores Gant
Defendant: Wyeth, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Pfizer, Inc. and Pharmacia & Upjohn Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2007cv02002
Filed: January 4, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED and ADJUDGED that this matter be administratively closed and removed from the Court's Docket, as set forth. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on February 1, 2012. (lw) Modified on 2/1/2012 to edit text(lw).
November 1, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Joint Motion to Stay and this case is stayed and further orders by this Court are as set out in this Order. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on November 1, 2011. (sh)
July 23, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER: directing all parties to confer and file a joint report with this Court as set forth. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on July 23, 2010. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gant v. Wyeth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth
Represented By: Catherine Melissa Corless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine Melissa Corless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Catherine Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia & Upjohn Company, LLC
Represented By: Catherine Melissa Corless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Gant
Represented By: Martin Daniel Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?