Parkhurst et al v. Tabor et al

Plaintiff: Ross Parkhurst, Amy Parkhurst and H.P.
Defendant: Stephen Tabor, Daniel Shue, Sebastian, County of and Chad Belt
Counter Claimant: Chad Belt
Counter Defendant: H.P., Ross Parkhurst and Amy Parkhurst
Case Number: 2:2007cv02068
Filed: June 27, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2009 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 167 Bill of Costs filed by Ross Parkhurst, H.P., and Amy Parkhurst. The Court finds that Defendant Chad Belt should reimburse Plaintiffs for one-half of such costs or $1206.86. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 24, 2009. (lw)
June 30, 2009 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 168 MOTION to Review Tax Returns In Camera filed by Patricia Hackler, Lee Hackler. That there is no reason to alter the order previously entered and the Respondents are to produce the tax returns in question to Plaintiffs no later than 7/28/09. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on June 30, 2009. (lw)
June 1, 2009 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 154 Motion to Set Aside Order.and Quash; affirming 153 Magistrate's Order; and granting 157 Motion for Order to Declare Payover Subordinate to Child Support Obligations as set forth. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on June 1, 2009. (lw)
December 29, 2008 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 114 Motion for Default Judgment denied as moot; and granting 118 Motion to Enter Agreed Payover Order. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 29, 2008. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parkhurst et al v. Tabor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Parkhurst
Represented By: Adrienne Barnett Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Parkhurst
Represented By: Adrienne Barnett Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.P.
Represented By: Adrienne Barnett Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Tabor
Represented By: Lori Freno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Shue
Represented By: Lori Freno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sebastian, County of
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Belt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Chad Belt
Represented By: Mark E. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: H.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Ross Parkhurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Amy Parkhurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?