Helm v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada

Plaintiff: Michael D. Helm
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Case Number: 2:2007cv02112
Filed: October 9, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendant's 34 Motion for Release of Bond Obligation and the Supersedeas Bond posted by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada is released; further ordered that the original Letter of Credit posted by defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada be returned to it, c/o Paul D. Waddell, Barrett & Deacon, P.A., P.O. Box 1506, Fayetteville, AR 72702. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on June 16, 2009. (rw)
March 30, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion to Stay. The defendant has five days from the date of this order to submit the referenced letter of credit to the Court. The Clerk is directed to accept the letter of credit as a supersedeas bond under Rule 62(d) of the Fe deral Rules of Civil Procedures. All attempts to execute upon the judgment are stayed until such time as the appeal of this matter is decided. The defendant shall be required to renew the letter of credit if it expires before the appeal is decided. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 30, 2009. (lw)(letter of credit received 4/1/09) Modified on 4/1/2009 to add text (lw).
March 2, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT as set forth. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 2, 2009. (rw)
November 24, 2008 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: that the decision of Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada to terminate ERISA benefits to Michael D. Helm under the Sparks Health System employee welfare benefit plan is reversed. That Michael D. Helm is entitled to judgment against Sun Life A ssurance Company of Canada in the sum of $240,000.00 for past benefits accrued but unpaid as of the date of this Order, for which judgment will be entered when issues of pre-judgment interest, attorney's fees, and costs have been resolved. That Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada reinstate benefits payments to Michael D. Helm, and continue paying same for as long as he remains eligible. Further, that any petition for pre-judgment interest, attorney's fees, and costs be filed within fourteen days of the date of this Order, and that any objection thereto be filed within eleven days thereafter. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on November 24, 2008. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helm v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D. Helm
Represented By: Stephanie Harper Easterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?