Palmer v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 2:2007cv02132
Filed: November 28, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER awarding Attorney Fees, in the amount of $3,155.66,. in favor of Linda A. Palmer against Social Security Administration Commissioner, ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 13 . Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on June 23, 2009. (sh)
June 2, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the EAJA filed by Linda A. Palmer. Objections to R&R due by 6/19/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on June 2, 2009. (lw)
January 29, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY for further consideration pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 29, 2009. (lw) Modified on 1/29/2009 to edit text(lw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?