Adams v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 2:2007cv02133
Filed: November 28, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 17, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion for Attorney Fees and awarding the amount of $2401.11. This amount shall be paid in addition to, and not out of, any past-due benefits plaintiff may be awarded in the future and adopting Report and Recommendations re 18 . Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on February 17, 2011. (sh) Modified on 2/17/2011 to edit text (sh).
October 16, 2008 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 9 , and REMANDS case to the Commissioner for further consideration pursuant to sentence six of 42 USC 405(g). Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on October 16, 2008. (sh)
September 26, 2008 9 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 3 Complaint filed by Richard F. Adams. Objections to R&R due by 10/14/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on September 26, 2008. (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?