Lewis v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Johnna Lewis
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 2:2008cv02014
Filed: February 19, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the Magistrate's 16 Report and Recommendations in toto and awarding plaintiff's 13 attorney fees in the amount of $3,303.72; further award should be paid directly to plaintiff's counsel and this amount shall be paid in addition to, and not out of, any past-due benefits plaintiff may be awarded in the future. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 4, 2009. (rw)
March 13, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: 10 order reversing and remanding case to the commissioner for further consideration, pursuant to sentence four of USC 405(g). Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 13, 2009. (sh)
February 23, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 3 Amended Complaint filed by Johnna Lewis, 1 Complaint filed by Johnna Lewis. Objections to R&R due by 3/12/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 23, 2009. (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnna Lewis
Represented By: Andrew A. Flake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?