Nelson v. Crawford County Detention Center

Plaintiff: Billy Joe Nelson
Defendant: Crawford County Detention Center
Case Number: 2:2008cv02037
Filed: May 9, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Arkansas
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 1, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN ITS ENTIRETY. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute, failure to obey the orders of this Court and/or failure to comply with Local Rule 5.5(c)(2) for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 1, 2009. (lw)
August 13, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Billy Joe Nelson. Objections to R&R due by 8/31/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on August 13, 2009. (rw)
June 2, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 7 , Accordingly, separate defendants Judge Cottrell, Prosecuting Attorney, Marc McCune and Public Defender Thurman Ragar are dismissed as defendants in this matter. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on June 2, 2009. (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Crawford County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Joe Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crawford County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?