Morkemo v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Monica Morkemo
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 2:2008cv02047
Filed: May 19, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: finding in favor of Monica Morkemo, and awarding Attorney's Fees in the amount of $1312.50, pursuant to 28 USC 2412, as to the Equal Access to Justice Act, and adopting, 18 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 4, 2009. (sh)
October 27, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 15 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Monica Morkemo. Objections to R&R due by 11/13/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 27, 2009. (sh)
August 27, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: REVERSING AND REMANDING CASE TO the Commissioner for further consideration, pursuant to sentence four of 42 USC 405(g). It is FURTHER ordered that the Magistrate's REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS are adopted. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 27, 2009. (sh)
July 9, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Monica Morkemo. Objections to R&R due by 7/27/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on July 9, 2009. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morkemo v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Morkemo
Represented By: Joseph Self
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?