King v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Bobby King
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 2:2008cv02068
Filed: July 2, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: awarding attorney fees in the amount of $6,039.20, in favor of Bobby King, and ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 17 . Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 11, 2010. (sh)
December 22, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Bobby King. Objections to R&R due by 1/8/2010. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 22, 2009. (lw)
November 5, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion to Supplement. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 5, 2009. (lw)
August 4, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT REVERSING AND REMANDING CASE TO THE COMMISSIONER for further consideration pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on August 4, 2009. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby King
Represented By: Davis Duty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?