Hill v. Norris, Director, Arkansas Department of Corrections

Petitioner: Lester Joe Hill
Respondent: Larry Norris, Director, Arkansas Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2008cv02082
Filed: July 24, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2011 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 88 Motion for Reconsideration by Lester Joe Hill. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on August 24, 2011. (sh)
August 5, 2011 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 86 Motion for a Transcript. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on August 5, 2011. (sh)
January 14, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 73 Motion for Certificate of Appealability for the reasons set forth in the Statement of Reasons. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 14, 2010. (lw)
November 2, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety. Accordingly the 28 U.S.C. 2254 motion is DENIED and DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on November 2, 2009. (lw)
June 17, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion to Limit Testimony as set forth. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on June 17, 2009. (lw)
January 20, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part as to the testimony of Wendy Hall and denying in part as to the testimony of Julie Burruss; as to 19 Motion in Limine. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 20, 2009. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Norris, Director, Arkansas Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lester Joe Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Larry Norris, Director, Arkansas Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?