Lee v. Overbey et al

Plaintiff: Melody L. Lee
Defendant: Bobby A. Overbey and Brent Higgins Trucking, Inc
Case Number: 2:2008cv02115
Filed: October 27, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Motor Vehicle Office
County: Crawford
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2010 244 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: that the case be, and it is hereby, dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of the settlement agreement. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 25, 2010. (lw)
January 19, 2010 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 219 Motion to Continue and denying 223 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. This matter remains scheduled for a jury trial beginning, 2/2/10. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 19, 2010. (lw)
January 14, 2010 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 212 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 14, 2010. (lw)
January 8, 2010 205 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 200 Motion to Bifurcate; and denying 202 Motion to Bifurcate. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 8, 2010. (lw)
December 14, 2009 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 182 Motion to Quash but only as to the date and time set out in the Notice and the parties are directed to secure a date and time so that Mr. Perry can be present at the depositions of Bryan Morton and Pamela Morton. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 14, 2009. (lw)
December 9, 2009 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 168 Motion to Compel. For those Interrogatories and Request GRANTED the Defendant shall respond within (10) days. Further the Plaintiff's request for costs and attorney fees is DENIED. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 9, 2009. (lw)
December 8, 2009 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 158 Motion for Order to Compel and the Cooke County District Attorney is authorized to release a copy of the audio recording to the Defendants. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 8, 2009. (lw)
December 3, 2009 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 147 Motion to Quash. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 3, 2009. (lw)
September 28, 2009 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 105 Motion for leave to Prohibit Defendant's from taking more then 10 depositions and to quash ; granting 111 Motion for Leave to take more than 10 depositions as set forth. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on September 28, 2009. (lw)
July 31, 2009 92 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 29 Motion for Determination of Controlling Law, filed by Brent Higgins Trucking, Inc. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on July 31, 2009. (lw)
June 1, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Motion to Seal. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on June 1, 2009. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Overbey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody L. Lee
Represented By: Martha J Cherbini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby A. Overbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Higgins Trucking, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?