Falcon Steel, Inc. v. J. Russell Flowers, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Falcon Steel, Inc.
Defendant: J. Russell Flowers, Inc., US Technology Marine Services, LLC and JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2009cv02007
Filed: January 23, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2011 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 219 Motion to Quash In Part Writ of Execution, as set forth. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on June 7, 2011. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified)(sh)
June 6, 2011 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 212 Motion for Emergency Relief and adopting Report and Recommendations in toto re 217 . Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on June 6, 2011. (sh)
February 28, 2011 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 173 Motion Pierce the Corporate Veil, and for the Discovery of Funds and to Enforce Execution of Judgment of Intervenor Rogers Industrial Supply Corp. is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on February 28, 2011. (sh)
January 3, 2011 205 Opinion or Order of the Court ***PLEASE DISREGARD DUPLICATE ENTRY RE #204.***.AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED ORDER re 191 MOTION for Writ of Assistanceas follows: USTM Services (and USTM Property if it is now in control of the Shipyard) are directed to allow access to the Shipy ard by Falcon Steel commencing on January 3, 2011, and for a period of six months thereafter, or until the Barges are completed and launched, or removed, whichever occurs sooner. Falcon Steel is to pay rental for the Shipyard to USTM Services (or to USTM Property if it is now in control of the Shipyard), at the rate of $1,600.00 per month, payable on the third day of each month starting January, 3, 2011. It is so ordered this 3rd day of January, 2011, nunc pro tunc the 22nd day of December, 2010. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on January 3, 2011. (sh) Modified on 1/3/2011 to note duplicate entry (rw).
June 22, 2010 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 166 Motion to Enter Satisfaction of Judgment. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on June 22, 2010. (lw)
March 31, 2010 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 86 Motion for Attorney Fees in favor of Falcon Steel, Inc. against US Technology Marine Services, LLC, in the amount of $51,533.45, same to be collected as costs. Further granting 89 Motion for Attorney Fees in favor of Rogers Industrial, Inc. against US Technology Marine Services, LLC in the amount of $10,207.50, same to be collected as costs. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 31, 2010. (lw)
November 17, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Falcon Steel, Inc. against US Technology Marine Services, LLC in the amount of $376,659.82; and in favor of Rogers Industrial, Inc. against US Technology Marine Services, LLC in the amount of $103,043.14 as set forth. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on November 17, 2009. (lw) Modified on 11/18/2009 to edit text(lw).
October 22, 2009 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part and not adopting in part Report and Recommendations re 50 and Report and Recommendation is adopted insofar as it recommends granting 35 Motion for TRO subject to plaintiff's posting of bond in the amount of $75,00 0.00; further the Report and Recommendation is not adopted insofar as it makes a preliminary determination of the amount of any lien or the properties to which it might attach; and denying 56 Motion to Strike. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 22, 2009. (rw)
September 17, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 35 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Enjoin Transfer of Barges filed by Falcon Steel, Inc. Objections to R&R due by 10/5/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on September 17, 2009. (sh)
July 27, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 32 , and denying 19 the Motion for TRO To Enjoin Sale, filed by Falcon Steel, Inc. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on July 27, 2009. (sh)
July 6, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 19 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Falcon Steel, Inc. Objections to R&R due by 7/23/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on July 6, 2009. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falcon Steel, Inc. v. J. Russell Flowers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Falcon Steel, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen B. Niswanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Russell Flowers, Inc.
Represented By: Joel J. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Technology Marine Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?