GE Commercial Distribution Finance Corporation v. Crabtree RV Center, Inc.

Plaintiff: GE Commercial Distribution Finance Corporation
Defendant: Crabtree RV Center, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv02035
Filed: April 1, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Crawford
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 63 Motion to Compel. Ordering that James Adams, Joyce Adams and Ezra Crabtree fully answer Textron's Post Judgment Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents no later than 2/15/10, on pain of sanctions. Further it is Ordered that the Clerk of Court file a copy of document #29 in case number 09-2044 in the captioned cases properly filed in case 09-2035, the lead case. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on February 5, 2010. (lw)
November 17, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Motion for Discovery; and Textron Financial Corporation is hereby authorized to take such discovery of defendants James G. Adams, Joyce C. Adams, and Ezra J. Crabtree as it reasonably deems necessary in aid of its judgment against these defendants, and the execution thereof. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on November 17, 2009. (lw)
October 30, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Textron Financial Corporation against Ezra J. Crabtree, James Gilbert Adams, and Joyce C. Adams, in the amount of $1,677,541.92, with interest thereon at.39% per annum until paid, for all of which execution may issue. Granting 36 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Textron Financial Corporation. Denying 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction on Action Initiated by Bank of America filed by Ezra James Crabtree, Joyce C. Adams, James Gilber t Adams, and further denying 33 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Guarantors filed by Bank of America, N.A. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 30, 2009. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-02035-JLH, 2:09-cv-02043-JLH, 2:09-cv-02044-JLH(lw)
April 29, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, that an administrative termination of the case be entered as to defendant Crabtree RV Center, Inc., only, without prejudice to the right of the parties to reopen the proceedings for good cause shown for entry of any stipulation or order, or fo r any other purpose required to obtain a final determination of the litigation as against defendant Crabtree RV Center, Inc. Further that this administrative termination not affect the claims of the plaintiffs as against other defendants in these consolidated cases. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on April 29, 2009. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-02035-JLH, 2:09-cv-02043-JLH, 2:09-cv-02044-JLH(lw)
April 23, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER in case 2:09-cv-02035-JLH; granting (2) Motion for TRO in case 2:09-cv-02044-JLH; ( Show Cause Hearing set for 5/1/2009 10:00 AM in Fort Smith -- 2nd flr (Rm 226) before Honorable James R. Marschewski.) Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on April 23, 2009, at 9:32 a.m. Associated Cases: 2:09-cv-02035-JLH, 2:09-cv-02044-JLH(lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GE Commercial Distribution Finance Corporation v. Crabtree RV Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GE Commercial Distribution Finance Corporation
Represented By: Kathryn A. Stocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crabtree RV Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?