Myers v. State of Arkansas

Plaintiff: Carl Edward Myers
Defendant: State of Arkansas
Case Number: 2:2009cv02086
Filed: July 13, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations in its entirety. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute and to obey the orders of this Court. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 28, 2009. (lw)
December 7, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Carl Edward Myers. Objections to R&R due by 12/24/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 7, 2009. (sh)
July 13, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the clerk to provisionally file the complaint. Further the plaintiff did not submit a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis, the clerk of the court is directed to provide the plaintiff with an in forma pauperis applicati on. The plaintiff is given up to and including 8/11/2009, in which to complete the IFP application. Should plaintiff fail to complete and return the application within the required period his complaint will become subject to dismissal for failure to obey a court order. The undersigned will determine at a later time whether the complaint should be served on the defendant. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on July 13, 2009. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers v. State of Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Edward Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?