CSK Partners, LLC v. LG Electronics USA, Inc.

Plaintiff: CSK Partners, LLC
Defendant: LG Electronics USA, Inc. and NI Group, LLC.
Case Number: 2:2009cv02106
Filed: September 8, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2011 105 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT ON DAMAGES, as set forth. Signed by Honorable Paul K. Holmes, III on March 16, 2011. (lw)
January 13, 2011 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 97 Motion for Default Judgment on the issue of liability only. The Court will take up the issue of the amount of damages to be adjudged against NI Group, LLC, at a separate hearing to be held on 3/7/11, at 1:30 pm. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on January 13, 2011. (lw)
August 25, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO COMPEL; re: 32 Motion to Compel. Full and complete answers are to be offered on or before Monday, 8/30/10. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on August 25, 2010. (lw)
July 27, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion for Default Judgment. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment by default in favor of Plaintiff against NI Group, LLC., on the issue of liability only. Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 55(b)(2), the Court will take up the issued of the amount of damages to be adjudged against NI Group, LLC, at a separate hearing to be held during the week of 1/10/11, which is the trial date in this case. Further the Court will take up the matter of attorneys' fees to be assessed against NI Group, LLC, at the separate hearing to be held during the week of 1/10/11. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on July 27, 2010. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSK Partners, LLC v. LG Electronics USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSK Partners, LLC
Represented By: Gregory G. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics USA, Inc.
Represented By: Rex M. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NI Group, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?