CDX Gas, LLC v. Anadarko Petroleum Coroporation et al

Plaintiff: CDX Gas, LLC
Defendant: Anadarko Petroleum Coroporation, Andromeda Partners, Jack R. Crissup, Deborah M. Crissup, Ream Interests, Inc. and Heidtman Mining, LLC.
Case Number: 2:2009cv02135
Filed: October 26, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AND ORDER as set forth re 57 Memorandum Opinion and Order, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Honorable Paul K. Holmes, III on March 31, 2011. (rw)
January 3, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Motion to Cancel Trial Date, Set Briefing Schedule, and Request for Oral Argument. Therefore, the Bench Trial scheduled for 1/20/11 is cancelled. Further Ordered that the parties submit simultaneous briefs in support of their resp ective positions on or before 1/20/11 and simultaneous responses on or before 3/3/11. Oral Argument set for 3/7/2011, 9:00 AM in Fort Smith, AR -- before Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on January 3, 2011. (lw) Modified on 1/3/2011 to edit date (lw).
October 19, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Amended Joint 38 Motion to Dismiss and for partial disbursement of funds held in the registry of the court; further ordered that the clerk of court make the following disbursements from funds held in the registry of the court in this case as set forth and each check is to be mailed to the attorney for its respective payee(s); further ordered that all claims as between Heidtman Mining, LLC, on the one hand, and Anadarko Petroleum Corporation; Andromeda Partners, Limited Partnersh ip; Jack R. Crissup and Deborah M. Crissup; and Ream Interests, Inc., on the other, are hereby dismissed with prejudice; further ordered that all claims as between Shriram Sebastian, LLC, on the one hand, and Anadarko Petroleum Corporation; Andromeda Partners, Limited Partnership; Jack R. Crissup and Deborah M. Crissup; and Ream Interests, Inc., on the other, remain scheduled for trial on 1/20/11. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 19, 2010. (rw)
January 19, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion to Substitute Party. The Clerk of Court is order to substitute EnerVest Operating, LLC for CDX Gas, LLC, as the plaintiff in this case, and further show C. Michael Daily as attorney the substituted plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on January 19, 2010. (lw) Modified on 1/19/2010 to edit text (lw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CDX Gas, LLC v. Anadarko Petroleum Coroporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CDX Gas, LLC
Represented By: C. Michael Dailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anadarko Petroleum Coroporation
Represented By: Robert M. Honea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andromeda Partners
Represented By: Robert M. Honea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack R. Crissup
Represented By: Robert M. Honea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah M. Crissup
Represented By: Robert M. Honea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ream Interests, Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Honea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidtman Mining, LLC.
Represented By: Mark W. Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?