Young v. Kim et al

Plaintiff: Thomas W. Young
Defendant: Won B Kim, Pacific Cargo Services, Inc., Olga M. Depadilla, Leodis Burgess, ML&S Trucking, Inc. and Marcus D. Morris
Case Number: 2:2009cv02148
Filed: November 30, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Franklin
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2011 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 95 Motion to Stay, and the case is removed from the trial docket of October 3, 2011, and the case is administratively terminated without prejudice to the right of the parties to reopen the proceedings upon resolution of the issues addressed in the Motion. Signed by Honorable Paul K. Holmes, III on August 23, 2011. (sh)
January 6, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as set forth re: 62 Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 6, 2011. (lw)
December 22, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as set forth re: 62 Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 22, 2010. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Kim et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W. Young
Represented By: J. Randolph Shock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Won B Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Cargo Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olga M. Depadilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leodis Burgess
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ML&S Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Jerry Jon Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus D. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?