Hanna v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Terri K. Hanna
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 2:2010cv02006
Filed: January 7, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT affirming the decision of the Administrative Law Judge, and adopting 13 , Report and Recommendations in toto, and dismisses Plaintiff's complaint with prejudice. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 14, 2011. (sh)
December 27, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Terri K. Hanna. Objections to R&R due by 1/13/2011. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 27, 2010. (lw)
January 20, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing complaint be filed nunc pro tunc as of January 6, 2010. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, retur n receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 20, 2010. (sh)
January 7, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing clerk to file Plaintiff's complaint provisionally prior to a determination regarding Plaintiff's status as an indigent. The Clerk is hereby directed to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of 1/6/10. Plaintiff is hereby dire cted to file amended application on or before 1/21/10. Should Plaintiff fail to comply within the required period of time, her complaint will become subject to summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 7, 2010. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanna v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri K. Hanna
Represented By: Fred L. Caddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?