Hopson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Michael E. Hopson
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 2:2010cv02080
Filed: June 15, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Crawford
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $2445.70. This amount should be paid in addition to, and not out of, any past due benefits which plaintiff may be awarded in the future. Further, any EAJA award by this Court should be made payable to plaintiff and not counsel. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on March 23, 2012. (sh)
October 20, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT affirming the favorable decision of the Commissioner and dismissing Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on October 20, 2011. (lw)
October 18, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as premature 16 plaintiff's Motion for EAJA Attorney Fees. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on October 18, 2011. (sh)
June 9, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER reversing and remanding this case to the Commissioner for further consideration pursuant to sentence four of 42 USC 405(g). Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on June 9, 2011. (sh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopson v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Hopson
Represented By: David K. Harp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?