Flynn v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Steven E Flynn
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 2:2010cv02156
Filed: October 14, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on December 18, 2012. (lw)
December 10, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REOPENING CASE. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on December 10, 2012. (sh)
September 28, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Social Security Transcript filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner, pages 307-418 of exhibits are missing. Accordingly, this matter will be administratively terminated pending the submission by the Commissioner of a certified copy of the relevant missing exhibits, within 60 days from the date of this Order, as set forth. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on September 28, 2011. (lw)
October 15, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting 3 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the d efendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 15, 2010. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flynn v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven E Flynn
Represented By: Fred L. Caddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?