Wheeler v. Tinsman et al

Plaintiff: Gary Lee Wheeler, Jr
Defendant: Laura Aquire, Dr. Tinsman, Captain Conger and Frank Atkinson
Case Number: 2:2011cv02002
Filed: January 6, 2011
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: Sebastian
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Presiding Judge: Paul K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 7, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT that Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on July 7, 2014. (lw)
March 18, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part and declining to adopt in part 62 Report and Recommendations. Further that plaintiff's 1983 claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE upon Plaintiff's request for dismissal. This case will be set for trial as to Plaintiff's ADA Claims by separate order. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on March 18, 2014. (lw)
April 23, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER for evidentiary hearing. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on April 23, 2013. (lw)
September 14, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety. Further, denying 25 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on September 14, 2012. (lw)
November 14, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Motion for Reconsideration. Further granting 20 Motion to Substitute Attorney, that Jason E. Owens be substituted as defendants attorney in place of Angela R. Echols terminated. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 14, 2011. (lw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler v. Tinsman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Aquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Tinsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Conger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Lee Wheeler, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?