Caradine v. Doe et al

Plaintiff: William F Caradine, II
Defendant: Doe and Nina Ridenour
Case Number: 2:2011cv02003
Filed: January 7, 2011
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety. Further denying 16 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by William F Caradine, II, as the appeal is not taken in good faith, because Plaintiffs claims are frivolous. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on June 10, 2011. (lw)
April 5, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety and denying plaintiff's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; further plaintiff's complaint is dismissed on the grounds that the federal claims are frivolous and fai l to state claims upon which relief may be granted; further plaintiff advised that this dismissal is considered a "strike" for purpose of the Prison Litigation Reform Act and directing the U.S. District Clerk to collect the $350.00 filing fee from plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on April 5, 2011. (rw)
January 6, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER immediately transferring case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/6/11. (bkp) [Transferred from ared on 1/7/2011.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caradine v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William F Caradine, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina Ridenour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?