J. Russell Flowers, Inc. et al v. US Technology Marine Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: J. Russell Flowers, Inc. and MKJ, Inc.
Defendant: Raymond L. Williams Trust and US Technology Marine Services, LLC
Counter_claimant: US Technology Marine Services, LLC and Raymond L. Williams Trust
Counter_defendant: J. Russell Flowers, Inc. and MKJ, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv02017
Filed: January 21, 2011
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fort Smith Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul K. Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 53 defendant's Motion in Limine, denying 54 plaintiffs Motion in Limine re Plaintiffs attorney serving as a witness at trial, and denying 55 plainatiffs Motion in Limine to present certain proof of damages at trial in support of their Counterclaim, and denying 56 plaintiffs Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on May 14, 2012. (sh)
January 31, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying request for cancellation of settlement conference re: 44 Order Setting/Resetting Hearings, as set forth. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 30, 2012. (lw)
January 6, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 15 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by US Technology Marine Services, LLC as set forth. This case is set for jury trial commencing March 19, 2012. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on January 6, 2012. (mfr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J. Russell Flowers, Inc. et al v. US Technology Marine Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond L. Williams Trust
Represented By: Joseph R Falasco
Represented By: Laura L. Mills
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Treece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Technology Marine Services, LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Treece
Represented By: Laura L. Mills
Represented By: Joseph R Falasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: US Technology Marine Services, LLC
Represented By: Laura L. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Raymond L. Williams Trust
Represented By: Laura L. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: J. Russell Flowers, Inc.
Represented By: Joel J. Henderson
Represented By: Edward Duncan Lamar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: MKJ, Inc.
Represented By: Joel J. Henderson
Represented By: Edward Duncan Lamar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Russell Flowers, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Duncan Lamar
Represented By: Joel J. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MKJ, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Duncan Lamar
Represented By: Joel J. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?